United States of America v. Morrow
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Larry G. Morrow
Case Number: 2:2022cv00615
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Larry G. Morrow by United States of America. (Burrell, Chase) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek.
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 10/19/2022 by United States of America as to Larry G. Morrow. (Burrell, Chase)
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Larry G. Morrow. (JK)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/26/2022. (JK)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Burrell, Chase)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United States of America. Related case(s): No (Burrell, Chase)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Chase Alan Burrell on behalf of United States of America. Lead Counsel: Chase A. Burrell. (Burrell, Chase)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-0615-JLB-KCD. (SJB)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry G. Morrow filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Burrell, Chase)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Chase Alan Burrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry G. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?