Kirkpatrick et al v. First Community Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KIRKPATRICK and SYDNEY KIRKPATRICK
Defendant: First Community Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv01158
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4001 National Insurance Flood Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gregorie Dolce and Tania Maria Williams of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
February 1, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by First Community Insurance Company.(Zaidi, Zareen)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Given the parties' agreement, and otherwise finding good cause, Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to 2/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/5/2024. (BLW)
January 5, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by First Community Insurance Company. (Unzicker, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek.
January 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John A. Unzicker, Jr on behalf of First Community Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: John A. Unzicker, Jr. (Unzicker, John)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 PROOF of service executed on 12/19/2023 by Michael Kirkpatrick, Sydney Kirkpatrick as to First Community Insurance Company (Williams, Tania) (Modified on 12/27/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tania Maria Williams on behalf of Michael Kirkpatrick, Sydney Kirkpatrick (Williams, Tania) Modified text on 12/14/2023 (BD).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 HURRICANE IAN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER which is referenced in and hereby attached to the #5 Case Management Scheduling Order (Hurricane Ian). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.) (CGW)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER (HURRICANE IAN): See Order for dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 12/11/2023. (CGW)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to First Community Insurance Company. (BD)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/11/2023. (CGW)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:23-cv-1158-JLB-KCD. (RLK)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Community Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21544334) filed by Michael Kirkpatrick, Sydney Kirkpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Williams, Tania) Modified text on 12/13/2023 (jkl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkpatrick et al v. First Community Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KIRKPATRICK
Represented By: Gregorie Dolce
Represented By: Tania Maria Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYDNEY KIRKPATRICK
Represented By: Gregorie Dolce
Represented By: Tania Maria Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Insurance Company
Represented By: John A. Unzicker, Jr.
Represented By: Zareen Zaidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?