Dudley et al v. American Zurich Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alton Dudley and Edna Dudley
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv00574
Filed: June 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings. This case is STAYED pending appraisal, and the Clerk must add a stay flag to the file and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THE CASE. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint report on the status of appraisal on or before October 16, 2024, and every ninety days thereafter until appraisal has ended. Within 15 days of a signed appraisal award, the parties are DIRECTED to jointly notify the Court of (a) what issues, if any, remain for the Court to resolve; (b) whether the stay needs to be lifted; and (c) how this action should move forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 7/18/2024. (CGW)
July 17, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Collum, William)
July 17, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by American Zurich Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Zaimaj, Henris)
July 11, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Appraisal by All Plaintiffs. (Robertson, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek.
July 8, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL James S. Robertson, III of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SET)
July 3, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #9 Case Management Scheduling Order Joint Certification Regarding Local Rules and Certification of Orders by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Zaimaj, Henris)
July 3, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edna Dudley. (Robertson, James)
July 1, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Stephanie Feldman of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
June 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Exception by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Zaimaj, Henris)
June 26, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Answer _ Affirmative Defenses (Policy))(Collum, William) Modified on 6/26/2024 to edit docket text (JDR).
June 21, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Zurich Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. is the only publicly traded parent company, with a listing on the Swiss stock exchange, and a further trading of American Depository Receipts., Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate Steadfast Insurance Company, an Illinois corporation for American Zurich Insurance Company. (Collum, William) Modified docket text on 6/24/2024 (SET).
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 HURRICANE IAN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER which is referenced in and hereby attached to the #9 Case Management Scheduling Order (Hurricane Ian). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 6/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.) (CGW)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER (HURRICANE IAN): See Order for dates and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 6/21/2024. (CGW)
June 21, 2024 Filing 8 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/21/2024. (CGW)
June 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by American Zurich Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket (Collum, William) Modified docket text on 6/21/2024 (JOS).
June 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William B. Collum on behalf of American Zurich Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: William B. Collum. (Collum, William)
June 21, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against American Zurich Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Edna Dudley, Alton Dudley. Filed in State Court on May 15, 2024. (JOS)
June 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Henris Zaimaj and William B. Collum of Local Rule 1.06(b), which requires a legible copy of each paper docketed and docket sheet in the state court. File the complete state court record using the Notice (Other) event. The state court record must be attached as separate files. Refer to the Attorney Civil Case Opening Manual (www.flmd.uscourts.gov), for details on how to attach and describe the state court record (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
June 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL All Counsel of Record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JOS)
June 20, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-574-SPC-KCD. (AA)
June 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlotte County Circuit Court, case number 24001173CA filed in State Court on 05/15/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22212964 filed by American Zurich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Composite 2, #3 Exhibit Composite 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Collum, William) Modified docket text on 6/21/2024 (JOS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley et al v. American Zurich Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By: Henris Zaimaj
Represented By: William B. Collum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton Dudley
Represented By: Stephanie Feldman
Represented By: James Sean Robertson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Dudley
Represented By: Stephanie Feldman
Represented By: James Sean Robertson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?