Shatter et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Alan J. Shatter and Carol A. Shatter
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2024cv00618
Filed: July 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alan J. Shatter, Carol A. Shatter. (Korn, Tyler)
July 10, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alan J. Shatter, Carol A. Shatter. Related case(s): No (Korn, Tyler)
July 10, 2024 Filing 8 COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT CASE EVENT -- NOTICE by Alan J. Shatter, Carol A. Shatter (Korn, Tyler) Modified on 7/11/2024 (JK).
July 9, 2024 Filing 7 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/9/2024. (WRW)
July 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Tyler B. Korn on behalf of Alan J. Shatter, Carol A. Shatter. Lead Counsel: Tyler B. Korn, Esq. (Korn, Tyler)
July 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Tyler B. Korn of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
July 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
July 8, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney. (CTR)
July 3, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-618-JLB-NPM. (ARL)
July 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22263161) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Supplement Appearance of Counsel)(Korn, Tyler) Modified on 7/3/2024 as to docket text (ARL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shatter et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan J. Shatter
Represented By: Tyler Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Shatter
Represented By: Tyler Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?