S.D. et al v. St. Johns County School District et al
Plaintiff: S.D. and M.P.
Defendant: St. Johns County School District, George Leidigh, Dawn Caronna and Debbie Moore
Case Number: 3:2009cv00250
Filed: March 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: St. Johns
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Morris
Presiding Judge: Harvey E. Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for reconsideration re 83 Order on motion to stay discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 11/24/2009. (JE)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 76 Motion to stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 10/1/2009. (JE)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to dismiss; denying 45 Motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to dismiss; denying as moot 52 Motion to stay discovery (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 7/29/2009. (TD)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 48 Motion to strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 7/7/2009. (JE)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 2 Motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/15/2009. (TD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.D. et al v. St. Johns County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.D.
Represented By: D. Gray Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.P.
Represented By: D. Gray Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Johns County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Leidigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Caronna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?