RC3, INC. v. Bieber Featured Case

Plaintiff: RC3, INC.
Defendant: Justin Bieber
Case Number: 3:2012cv00193
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: Duval
Referring Judge: Thomas E. Morris
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2012 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Justin Bieber with Jury Demand filed by RC3, INC..(Sopotnick, Brad)
February 28, 2012 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment)(VMF) Modified to edit text on 2/29/2012 (DTS).
February 28, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER to strike re: 1 Complaint filed by RC3, INC. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/28/2012. (VMF)
February 27, 2012 2 AMENDED STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Jacksonville Divisional Judges on 05/25/05. (RH)
February 24, 2012 SUMMONS issued as to Justin Bieber. (RH)
February 24, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Bieber with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number JAX4396) filed by RC3, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(RH) Stricken pursuant to Court's Order Doc. #3. Modified on 2/29/2012 (DTS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RC3, INC. v. Bieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RC3, INC.
Represented By: Brad Sopotnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?