Doolin v. American Optical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stacey Doolin
Defendant: American Optical Corporation, Borg Warner Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International, Inc. and Pneumo Abex LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00778
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: Flagler
Presiding Judge: Patricia D. Barksdale
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting, in part, 118 Pneumo Abex LLC's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Causation Experts; granting, in part, 181 Ford Motor Company's Amended Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff& #039;s Causation Experts; granting 122 Pneumo Abex LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 127 Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Pneumo A bex LLC and Ford Motor Company. With one noted exception, the Clerk of the Court is further directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines as moot and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/25/2018. (JW)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER striking 128 , 129 , 130 , 131 , 134 , 175 , and 176 Notices of Joinder. Defendants shall have up to and including April 6, 2018, to file amended dispositive and Daubert motions, if they so choose. Such motions shall not exceed thi rty (30) pages in length. Plaintiff shall have up to and including April 25, 2018, to respond to any amended motions. To the extent Defendants were previously granted leave to reply, such replies are due no later than May 10, 2018. The final pretrial conference is continued to October 22, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial set for trial term commencing on November 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 3/22/2018. (MHM)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying without prejudice 91 Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Amended Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 92 Defendant Ford Motor Company's Amended Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/17/2017. (JW)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying 90 Ford Motor Company's motion to strike the plaintiff's affidavit. Finding a hearing unnecessary, the Court also denies Ford's request for a hearing on the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/13/2017. (BGK)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Sanctions. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/22/2017. (PTB)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 25 Defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC's Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/11/2016. (MHM)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Plaintiff shall have until July 11, 2016, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/27/2016. (MHM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doolin v. American Optical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Doolin
Represented By: Marc Phillip Kunen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Corporation
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Susan J. Cole
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?