Sky Enterprises, LLC v. Offshore Design & Drilling Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sky Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Offshore Design & Drilling Services, LLC, Offshore Brokerage International, LLC, George Cammack and Philip Aldridge
Case Number: 3:2016cv00916
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: St. Johns
Presiding Judge: Patricia D. Barksdale
Presiding Judge: Timothy J. Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 42 Sky's Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Counterclaim. Defendants shall file an amended answer that includes demands for attorney's fees that comport with this Order by 6/29/18. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/4/2018. (SEJ)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER overruling 36 Defendants' Objections to R&R; adopting 33 R&R of the Magistrate Judge; denying 23 Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; denying 28 Defendants' motion to strike; lifting the stay of merits discovery; directing the parties to jointly file a case management report by 2/23/18. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/31/2018. (SEJ)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 5 Defendants' motion to dismiss for the reasons stated in this Order. Plaintiff's 2 complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 2/27/17. Defendants shall file an answer or motion to dismiss by 3/20/17. If a motion to dismiss is filed, Plaintiff shall respond by 4/10/17. Discovery on the merits remains STAYED pending the Court's entry of a CMSO. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/8/2017. (SEJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sky Enterprises, LLC v. Offshore Design & Drilling Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Trevor Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Design & Drilling Services, LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Brokerage International, LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Cammack
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Aldridge
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?