Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund, et. al. v. Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: City of Warren General Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Paul G Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Benson K. Woo and Frank A. Ruperto
Petitioner: Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund and Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund
Case Number: 3:2018cv00771
Filed: August 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 93 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to this Court's Order, entered March 29, 2019, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Paul G. Boynton, Frank A. Ruperto, and Benson K. Woo, and against Plaintiffs Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund and Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/29/2019. (BD)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to correct the caption of the case; denying #83 Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Extraneous Materials and References Thereto in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint; granting #69 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint; directing the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment in accordance with this Order and close the file. The Court reserves jurisdiction to determine whether sanctions are appropriate against any of the parties or their attorneys. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 3/29/2019. (JW)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER regarding #90 Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Change of Firm Affiliation; Clerk to update docket accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/19/2019. (KAW)
February 14, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund (NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION) (Reise, Jack)
October 17, 2018 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 MOTION to Strike Extraneous Materials and References Thereto in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Set Deadline for Plaintiffs' Reply. Lead Plaintiffs Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund and Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund shall file a reply to Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Extraneous Materials and References Thereto in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 86) no later than 10/17/2018. The proposed order attached to the Motion (Doc. No. 87) is STRICKEN, and the Clerk shall remove it from the electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/10/2018. (MDC)
October 8, 2018 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 Response in Opposition to Motion by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack)
October 3, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION to Strike Extraneous Materials and References Thereto in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Paul G Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K. Woo. (Nichols, Tracy)
September 20, 2018 Filing 85 REPLY Memorandum in Support of Their #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul G Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K. Woo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nichols, Tracy) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (BD).
September 20, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit re #69 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Paul G Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K. Woo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nichols, Tracy) Modified text on 9/20/2018 (BD).
September 19, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION to Strike Extraneous Materials and References Thereto in Defendants' #69 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Modified text on 9/19/2018 (BD).
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Joint Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation. Defendants are permitted to file a 15 page reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is permitted to file a 10 page reply to Defendants' to be filed response in opposition to Plaintiff's to be filed motion to strike. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/18/2018. (JW)
September 17, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to file For Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitations by All Defendants. (Bean, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 80 Opposition to Defendants' #69 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (BD)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent Act. Derek L. Watkins is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Lead Plaintiffs Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund and Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, with Jack Reise and the law firm of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP as local counsel. Mr. Watkins shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so.Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/3/2018. (MDC)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #73 , #74 , #75 , and #76 Unopposed Motions to Withdraw Christopher M. Wood, Jerry E. Martin, Mario Alba, Jr., and Samuel H. Rudman as Counsel of Record. Mr. Wood, Mr. Martin, Mr. Alba, and Mr. Rudman are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Lead Plaintiffs Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund and Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund. Lead Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/2/2018. (MDC)
August 2, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Derek L. Watkins, appearing on behalf of Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX028596.) Related document: #77 MOTION for Derek L. Watkins to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
July 30, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Derek L. Watkins to appear pro hac vice by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Derek L. Watkins)(Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 30, 2018 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Samuel H. Rudman to withdraw as attorney by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 30, 2018 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Mario Alba, Jr. to withdraw as attorney by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 30, 2018 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Jerry E. Martin to withdraw as attorney by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 30, 2018 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Christopher M. Wood to withdraw as attorney by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent Act; Thomas C. Michaud is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf Lead Plaintiffs Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund and Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, with Jack Reise and the law firm of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP as local counsel; Mr. Michaud shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/25/2018. (BHC)
July 24, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Thomas C. Michaud, appearing on behalf of Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX028462.) Related document: #71 MOTION for Thomas C. Michaud to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
July 20, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Thomas C. Michaud to appear pro hac vice by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Special Admission Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Thomas C. Michaud)(Reise, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 19, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Richard Astley on behalf of Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund (Astley, Stephen) Modified text on 7/19/2018 (Notified counsel to use correct court caption on future filings) (BD).
July 16, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Nichols, Tracy)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Joint Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/16/2018. (JW)
July 13, 2018 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Paul G Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K. Woo. (Bean, Daniel)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw W. Brantley Phillips, Jr. as Counsel of Record. Mr. Phillips is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants. Defendants will continue to be represented by other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/10/2018. (MDC)
July 9, 2018 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for W. Brantley Phillips, Jr. to withdraw as attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw W. Brantley Phillips, Jr. as Counsel of Record by Paul G Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K. Woo. (Kernisky, Allison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Joint Motion for Relief From the Requirements of Local Rules 3.05 and 4.04 and Entry of Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Response to Amended Complaint due 7/16/2018. Response to Motion to Dismiss due 8/30/2018. Reply due 9/20/2018. Case Management Report due within ten days of the resolution of any motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/6/2018. (JW)
July 5, 2018 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Relief from the Requirements of Local Rules 3.05 and 4.04 and Entry of Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (Notified counsel to use correct court caption on future filings) (BD).
June 28, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Shonson on behalf of Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund (Shonson, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Reise on behalf of Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund (Reise, Jack) Modified on 6/28/2018 (PAM). Counsel notified to change division style on future pleadings
June 21, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 3. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
June 15, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE: Based upon the parties' filings, the Court is satisfied of the existence of subject matter jurisdiction over this action. (DS)
June 15, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment of 3:18-cv-00771-J-34JRK. Signed by Deputy Clerk. (BD)
June 14, 2018 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:17-cv-01167. File received electronically
June 14, 2018 Filing 56 REPLY in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida filed by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K Woo. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida (Doc. No. 23) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Also pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief (Doc. No. 45). The Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk is instructed to file the attached Reply. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/14/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/14/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants shall file their response to the Amended Complaint within 30 days of entry of an order deciding the Transfer Motion. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiffs shall have 45 days to file their response in opposition. Any reply to Lead Plaintiffs' opposition to a motion to dismiss will be due 21 days following the filing of Lead Plaintiffs' opposition. The parties will meet and confer and submit an amended case management statement and proposed schedule within 10 days of any denial of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/8/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/8/2018. (tm) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 52 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference is reset to Thursday, March 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/22/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 50 Joint MOTION Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K Woo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The time in which to respond will be addressed with other scheduling matters at the initial case management conference set for March 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/21/2018. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/14/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Rule 12(b)(3) Motion (Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Reply Brief)(Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Amended Complaint,, filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. for all purposes. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/25/2018. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund, Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund. Benson K Woo waiver sent on 1/22/2018. (Reise, Jack) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Amended Complaint,, by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K Woo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Phillips, W.)[Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Disregard DE #38 - entered in error. See DE# 40 for corrected Response. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Jack Reise filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund re: #40 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- google.com/maps and distancecalculator.net printouts, #2 Exhibit B- kayak.com printouts, #3 Exhibit C- RYAM 2016 Form 10-K, #4 Exhibit D- Westlaw Decisions)(Reise, Jack) Modified on 1/25/2018 (dt). [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 24, 2018 Filing 38 *DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - SEE DE#40 FOR CORRECTED RESPONSE* RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Reise, Jack) Modified on 1/25/2018 (dt). [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Stephen R. Astley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/23/2018. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Jack Reise to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/23/2018. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Elizabeth A. Shonson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/23/2018. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Stephen R. Astley from the United States District Court for the Southern of Florida filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for attorney(s) Stephen R. Astley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2595741) by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Jack Reise from the United States District Court for the Southern of Florida filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for attorney(s) Jack Reise to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2595712) by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Elizabeth A. Shonson from the United States District Court for the Southern of Florida filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 22, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for attorney(s) Elizabeth Shonson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2595684) by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund. (Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 17, 2018 Filing 28 Summons issued as to Benson K Woo. (Service copy mailed to Atty Wood) (ab) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws against Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto, Benson K Woo, filed by Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund, Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund- Certification, #2 Exhibit B- Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund- Certification, #3 Exhibit C- Eastman Complaint, #4 Attachment Summons- Benson K. Woo)(Wood, Christopher) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Paul G. Boynton, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Frank A. Ruperto)(Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Stephen P. Warren filed by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. District Court Judicial Caseload Profile, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt from Rayonier's Form 10-K for year ended Dec. 31, 2016, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt from Eastman Chemical Company's Form 10-K for year ended Dec. 31, 2016, #4 Exhibit D - Complaint filed in Eastman Chem. Co. v. Rayonier, Sullivan Co. Tenn. Chancery Court, #5 Exhibit E - Complaint filed in Adinolfi-Fithian v. Local 295-IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, S.D.N.Y., #6 Exhibit F - Annual Funding Notice for Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund, #7 Exhibit G - Print-out from City of Warren General Employees Retirement System Website, #8 Exhibit H - Print-outs from www.travelmath.com)(Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida filed by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto . (Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
January 10, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, Alternatively, to Transfer to the Middle District of Florida by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. (Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/13/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 31, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund re #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff Notice of Unopposed Motion (Martin, Jerry) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: In light of the Stipulation and Order setting a briefing schedule (Docket No. 13), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled November 1, 2017 is CONTINUED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/27/2017. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Allison Kernisky, Tracy Nichols and Stephen Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/23/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney(s) Allison Kernisky, Tracy Nichols, Stephen Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $225 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2543106) by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jerry E. Martin filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund re: #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Joint Declaration in Support, #5 Exhibit E - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume)(Martin, Jerry) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund, Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Blitz v. AgFeed, #2 Attachment Burges v. BancorpSouth, #3 Attachment Garden City Emps. Ret. Sys. v. Psychiatric Solutions (2010), #4 Attachment Garden City Emps. Ret. Sys. v. Psychiatric Solutions (2012))(Martin, Jerry) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund, Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Jerry) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Brantley Phillips, Jr on behalf of Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto (Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Response to Complaint and Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/14/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. (Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 11 STIPULATION and Proposed Order regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. (Phillips, W.) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/8/2017. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney(s) Samuel H. Rudman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee PAID - Receipt #346750473222) by City of Warren General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Mario Alba, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/7/2017. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney(s) Mario Alba, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee PAID) by City of Warren General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto. Summonses mailed to counsel for service. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 18, 2017 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Samuel H. Rudman, Mario Alba, Jr, Thomas C. Michaud: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 9/8/2017. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by City of Warren General Employees' Retirement System. (jw) [Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]
August 17, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul G. Boynton, Rayonier Advanced Materials Inc., Frank A. Ruperto (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2501917), filed by City of Warren General Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)[Transferred from tnmd on 6/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund, et. al. v. Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G Boynton
Represented By: Stephen Warren
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Nichols
Represented By: Allison Kernisky
Represented By: Tracy A. Nichols
Represented By: Stephen P. Warren
Represented By: Daniel Kearney Bean
Represented By: Louise McAlpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayonier Advanced Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Warren
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Nichols
Represented By: Allison Kernisky
Represented By: Tracy A. Nichols
Represented By: Stephen P. Warren
Represented By: Daniel Kearney Bean
Represented By: Louise McAlpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benson K. Woo
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Allison Kernisky
Represented By: Tracy A. Nichols
Represented By: Stephen P. Warren
Represented By: Daniel Kearney Bean
Represented By: Louise McAlpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank A. Ruperto
Represented By: Stephen Warren
Represented By: W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Nichols
Represented By: Allison Kernisky
Represented By: Tracy A. Nichols
Represented By: Stephen P. Warren
Represented By: Daniel Kearney Bean
Represented By: Louise McAlpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Local 295 IBT Employer Group Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: Stephen R. Astley
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Jack Reise
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Shonson
Represented By: Derek L. Watkins
Represented By: Stephen Richard Astley
Represented By: Constantine Economides
Represented By: Andrew T. Rees
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michigan Carpenters' Pension Fund
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: Stephen R. Astley
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Jack Reise
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Shonson
Represented By: Derek L. Watkins
Represented By: Stephen Richard Astley
Represented By: Constantine Economides
Represented By: Andrew T. Rees
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Warren General Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Thomas C. Michaud
Represented By: Mario Alba, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wood
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?