Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 3:2018cv01434
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to the Complaint. In light of the ongoing lapse in appropriations to the Department of Justice, Defendant's Response to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed within 30 days after the lapse in appropriations ends. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/22/2019. (MM)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to extend time to File Response to Complaint by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Cunningham, Collette)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 12/17/2018 by Center for Biological Diversity as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Lopez, Jaclyn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Lopez, Jaclyn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 3 (MGG)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, US Attorney, US Attorney General. (TSW)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:18-cv-1434-J-20MCR. (SJB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14882715) filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Lopez, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?