Davis v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marvin Davis
Defendant: Harley Davidson Motor Company Inc and Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01503
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
2 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 dismissing this case without prejudice. The Clerk should close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/8/2019. (SEJ)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Marvin Davis (Hobbs, Ryan)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 , #13 , and #14 Unopposed Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Written Designations and Consents to Act. Nicholas W. Armstrong, Garrett Owens, and Jacob M. Tubbs are permitted to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff with Ryan B. Hobbs as local counsel. Mr. Armstrong, Mr. Owens, and Mr. Tubbs shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system.Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/4/2019. (MDC)
January 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nicholas W. Armstorng, Garrett Owens and Jacob M. Tubbs, appearing on behalf of Marvin Davis (Filing fee $450 receipt number TPA055092.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Jacob M. Tubbs to appear pro hac vice, #12 Unopposed MOTION for Nicholas Armstrong to appear pro hac vice, #13 Unopposed MOTION for Garrett Owens to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Jacob M. Tubbs to appear pro hac vice by Marvin Davis. (Hobbs, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Garrett Owens to appear pro hac vice by Marvin Davis. (Hobbs, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Nicholas Armstrong to appear pro hac vice by Marvin Davis. (Hobbs, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson, Inc., Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc... (Klein, Steven)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have up to and including 2/15/2019 to respond to the Class Action Complaint (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/9/2019. (MDC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond to #1 Complaint, by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (Eubanks, Ernest) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 1/9/2019 to create docket entry relationship and edit text. (TMC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Special Appearance by Ernest H. Eubanks, Jr, Samantha Duke and Steven Klein on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. (Eubanks, Ernest) Modified on 1/9/2019 to edit text. (TMC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 3:18-cv-1503-J-20JRK. Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of recusal; directing the Clerk to reassign this case in accordance with standard assignment procedures. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/4/2019. (MGG)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 12/26/2018 by Marvin Davis as to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (Hobbs, Ryan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. (TSW)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:18-cv-1503-J-20JRK. (SJB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harley Davidson Motor Company Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14951969) filed by Marvin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Hobbs, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Davis
Represented By: Ryan Blake Hobbs
Represented By: Garrett Owens
Represented By: Nicholas W. Armstrong
Represented By: Jacob M. Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Davidson Motor Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ernest H. Eubanks, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Ira Klein
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?