Roor International BV et al v. Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store, Hady Safar and Roy Safar
Case Number: 3:2019cv00062
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
2 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Heekin, Jr on behalf of Hady Safar, Roy Safar, Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store (Heekin, Robert) Modified on 3/4/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case number on all pleadings(TSW).
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Hady Safar. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 1/22/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 1/23/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Roy Safar. (Sasson, Jamie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:19-cv-62-J-20MCR. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 1/16/2019. (JW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Roy Safar. (RH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Hady Safar. (RH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store. (RH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (RH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Based upon the #1 Complaint, the Court is satisfied of the existence of subject matter jurisdiction over this action. (MAM)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-62-J-34MCR. (SJB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15004102) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Souhel Safar, Inc., d/b/a Oceanway Food Store
Represented By: Robert A. Heekin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hady Safar
Represented By: Robert A. Heekin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Safar
Represented By: Robert A. Heekin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?