Iconic Content, LLC v. Unknown officer, director, or owner et al

Plaintiff: Iconic Content, LLC
Defendant: Hyson International Corp., Unknown user "bigballashotcalla", Unknown officer, director, or owner, Unknown user "peterman5552" and Unknown user "sexmaster2018"
Case Number: 3:2019cv00391
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER terminating #35 motion for discovery; granting #37 motion for discovery. Plaintiff may serve the subpoenas attached to the Motion on an expedited basis. The deadline for service of process is extended to August 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/1/2019. (ADM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED MOTION for Discovery from Third Parties and Motion for Extension of time to serve the remaining defendants by Iconic Content, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed subpoenas duces tecum)(Klema, Griffin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 7/1/2019 to edit text (PAM).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER taking under advisement #35 motion for discovery. Plaintiff's compliance due July 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/28/2019. (ADM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery from Third Parties and Motion for Extension of time to serve the remaining defendants by Iconic Content, LLC. (Klema, Griffin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #28 and #26 motion for discovery; granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/26/2019. (ADM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Edward Kupka re #30 Response in Opposition to Motion by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Helen Roberson re #30 Response in Opposition to Motion by Hyson International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: June 18, 2019 letter, #2 Exhibit B: June 18, 2019 letter)(Roberson, Helen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer , #28 MOTION for Discovery as to Jurisdiction over Defendant Hyson International Corp. filed by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer by Iconic Content, LLC. (Klema, Griffin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit text (PAM).
June 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Discovery as to Jurisdiction over Defendant Hyson International Corp. by Iconic Content, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite 1)(Klema, Griffin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Hyson International Corp. shall respond to #26 Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Discovery no later than June 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/14/2019. (ADM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report and Motion for limited discovery filed by Iconic Content, LLC. (Klema, Griffin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST for oral argument re #23 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Joshua Chen re #23 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss complaint or in the Alternative to Transfer by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: On or before June 13, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a response to #20 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report, or #20 the Motion will be treated as unopposed. The parties' deadline to file a Case Management Report is STAYED pending the resolution of #20 the Motion. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/6/2019. (AMP)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER: #19 Consent Motion to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant Hyson International Corp. is GRANTED. Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss shall not exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/5/2019. (AMP)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Hyson International Corp. (Roberson, Helen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Hyson International Corp. (Roberson, Helen) Modified on 6/5/2019 to edit text (PAM).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Neil Friedman has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/28/2019. (ADM)
May 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Neil B. Friedman, appearing on behalf of Hyson International Corp. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030873.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Neil Friedman to appear pro hac vice. (TSW)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney John Thomas Nelson is relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Defendant Hyson International Corp. in this matter, but he shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/23/2019. (ADM)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Neil Friedman to appear pro hac vice by Hyson International Corp.. (Roberson, Helen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendant Hyson International Corp. d/b/a Cybercon, Inc. by Hyson International Corp. (Roberson, Helen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 5/23/2019 to edit text (PAM).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Despite Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion, the Court finds good cause for the two-week extension, which Hyson's counsel represents is the last request for extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Defendant Hyson International Corp. shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/22/2019. (ADM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief and Demand for Jury Trial and incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Iconic Content, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Goldberg email, #2 Exhibit Peacock email)(Klema, Griffin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief and Demand for Jury Trial by Hyson International Corp. (Roberson, Helen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit text (PAM).
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Peacock Roberson on behalf of Hyson International Corp. (Roberson, Helen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hyson International Corp.. (Nelson, John)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Hyson International Corp.'s answer or response to the Complaint is due 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/3/2019. (ADM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hyson International Corp.. (Nelson, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Nelson on behalf of Hyson International Corp. (Nelson, John)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 04/11/2019 by Iconic Content, LLC as to Hyson International Corp. (Klema, Griffin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (PAM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Hyson International Corp. (PAM)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-391-J-39MCR. (SJB)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for damages and injunctive relief against Hyson International Corp., Unknown officer, director, or owner, Unknown user "bigballashotcalla", Unknown user "peterman5552", Unknown user "sexmaster2018" with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15322623) filed by Iconic Content, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS44, #3 Proposed Summons)(Klema, Griffin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iconic Content, LLC v. Unknown officer, director, or owner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyson International Corp.
Represented By: John Thomas Nelson
Represented By: Neil B. Friedman
Represented By: Helen Peacock Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown user "bigballashotcalla"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown officer, director, or owner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown user "peterman5552"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown user "sexmaster2018"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iconic Content, LLC
Represented By: Griffin C. Klema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?