Feldman, et al v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Barbara Feldman and Edward Feldman
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00419
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motions Requiring Briefs re: #5 Motion to Strike and #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman (Rousseau, Davarian) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (BD).
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production by All Plaintiffs. (Rousseau, Davarian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified text on 6/27/2019 (BD).
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: MOTION HEARING held on 6/24/2019; denying #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW)
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Case management and scheduling order by Target Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation, Other Affiliate Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate William T. Stone, Other Affiliate Barry B Ansbacher, Other Affiliate Barbara Feldman, Other Affiliate Edward Feldman for Target Corporation.. (Stone, William)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 the plaintiffs' motion to extend the time to file legal memoranda on the four motions filed in state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/16/2019. (ABK)
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2019 at 02:30 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. (JW)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements due 6/13/2019. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/26/2019. Dispositive motions due by 5/6/2020. Pretrial statement due by 9/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Case Management Report by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman. (Rousseau, Davarian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rousseau, Davarian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery served to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of TIme, #3 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit Correspondence from Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit Correspondence to Plaintiff)(Jacobs, Dana)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Supporting Briefs in according to Local Rule 4.02C by Target Corporation. (Jacobs, Dana)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Supporting Briefs in according to Local Rule 4.02C by All Plaintiffs. (Rousseau, Davarian)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Remand and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by All Plaintiffs. (Rousseau, Davarian) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (BD).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding #5, #6, #7, #8 pending motions filed in state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/17/2019. (ABK)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.01(d). Signed by Deputy Clerk. (BD)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman. (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Better Responses to Plaintiff' First Request for Production by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman. (Originally filed in State Court) (BD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Interlineation by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint) (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses re: #4 Answer to Complaint by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman. (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by Target Corporation. (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Barbara Feldman, Edward Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-419-J-34PDB. (SJB)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 16-2018-CA-8730 filed in State Court on December 19, 2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15349776 filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 State Court COMPLAINT, #6 State Court ANSWER, #7 State Court Pending Motions, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stone, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feldman, et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Feldman
Represented By: Davarian Rousseau
Represented By: Barry Barnett Ansbacher
Represented By: Davarian T. Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Feldman
Represented By: Davarian Rousseau
Represented By: Barry Barnett Ansbacher
Represented By: Davarian T. Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: William T. Stone
Represented By: Dana Aubrey Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?