GCA Services Group, Inc. v. American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79
Plaintiff: GCA Services Group, Inc.
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79 and American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79
Case Number: 3:2019cv00464
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09:10
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including July 17, 2019 to respond to the Amended Complaint #3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/10/2019. (TSP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended document by American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79 (Rind, Osnat). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 6/10/2019 to edit text (JSG).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including June 12, 2019 to respond to the Amended Complaint #3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/28/2019. (TSP)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Osnat Kate Rind on behalf of American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79 (Rind, Osnat)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended document by American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79. (Rind, Osnat) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on May 8, 2019 by GCA Services Group, Inc. as to American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79. (Margulies, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79. (JSG)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by GCA Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA, #2 Exhibit Memorandum Agreement, #3 Exhibit Award, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Margulies, Richard). Modified on 4/24/2019 to edit text (JSG).
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-464-J-32JBT. (SJB)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTRY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES FLORIDA COUNCIL 79 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15380723) filed by GCA Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Margulies, Richard) Modified on 4/23/2019 to contact counsel's office regarding Summons - clerk is unable to issue because the Defendant's name is not listed properly. Counsel's office will re-file (JSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GCA Services Group, Inc. v. American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GCA Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard N. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79
Represented By: Christina Sabine Gornail
Represented By: Osnat Kate Rind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, Country and Municipal Employees Florida Council 79
Represented By: Osnat Kate Rind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?