Kinard v. Centurion of Florda, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roy David Kinard
Defendant: John Doe #1-3, C. Balbuena, M.D., Dr. Z. Haims, Dr. A. Bucareli, M.D., Erron Campbell, Thomas Reimers, D. Burrows, ARNP, Daniel Cherry, T. Lopez, M.D., Mark S. Inch, Centurion of Florda, LLC and Corizon of Florida
Case Number: 3:2019cv00490
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE advising the parties that document no. S-13 is an executed Return of Service dated June 20, 2019, as to Defendant Centurion. (CAW)
June 26, 2019 Sealed Document S-13 (BD)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Limited Discovery by Corizon of Florida, T. Lopez, M.D.. (Toomey, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Corizon of Florida, T. Lopez, M.D. identifying Corporate Parent Valitas Holdings, Inc. for Corizon of Florida.. (Toomey, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/21/19 by T. Lopez, M.D. as to T. Lopez, M.D.. (Toomey, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 6/21/19 by Corizon of Florida as to Corizon of Florida. (Toomey, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg A. Toomey on behalf of Corizon of Florida, T. Lopez, M.D. (Toomey, Gregg)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of special appointment; directing service of process upon Defendants; notice to Plaintiff; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/31/2019. (CAW)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance with #5 Court's Order dated 5/10/2019 by Roy David Kinard (BD)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to submit 12 copies of the Complaint for service of process by 6/11/2019; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/10/2019. (CAW)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of compliance by Roy David Kinard (RH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/2/2019. (JW)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Roy David Kinard. (RH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Roy David Kinard. (postmarked 4/29/19, no service copies)(RH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinard v. Centurion of Florda, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Balbuena, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Z. Haims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. A. Bucareli, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erron Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Reimers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Burrows, ARNP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lopez, M.D.
Represented By: Gregg A. Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Florda, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon of Florida
Represented By: Gregg A. Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy David Kinard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?