Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.171.208.61 and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00506
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 6/13/2019. (BHC)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Third-Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Mamone, Tyler). Modified on 6/12/2019 to edit text (JSG).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER taking under advisement #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority; on or before 6/17/2019, Plaintiff shall file the proposed subpoena that is the subject of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 6/10/2019. (BHC)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #8 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Mamone, Tyler)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mamone, Tyler)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JSG)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-506-J-32JRK. (SJB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Mamone, Tyler)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Mamone, Tyler)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mamone, Tyler)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.171.208.61 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15418217) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mamone, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tyler Mamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.171.208.61
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?