HERNANDEZ v. JONES
Plaintiff: ARTURO HERNNDEZ, Arturo Hernandez and KING ARTHUR
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER JONES
Case Number: 3:2019cv00554
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFER to Orlando Division and assigned case number 6:19-cv-00962-ORL-37GJK (AEJ)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk to TRANSFER this case to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida, United States District Court. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/22/2019. (AMP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Agreement to Transfer Case to Orlando Division by Arturo Hernandez re #5 Order to show cause (Menker, James) Modified text on 5/21/2019. (AEJ)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (AEJ)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before May 24, 2019, why this case should not be transferred to the Orlando Division. Alternatively, if Plaintiff agrees this case should be transferred to the Orlando Division, a notice of agreement to transfer shall be filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/14/2019. (AMP)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Christopher Jones. (AEJ)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-554-J-39JBT. (SJB)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by ARTURO HERNANDEZ. (Menker, James) Modified text on 5/13/2019. (AEJ)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER JONES with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15452195) filed by ARTURO HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Menker, James) Modified text on 5/13/2019. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ v. JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTURO HERNNDEZ
Represented By: James R. Menker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Hernandez
Represented By: James R. Menker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KING ARTHUR
Represented By: James R. Menker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?