Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. v. Azar

Plaintiff: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a UF Health Jacksonville and Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc.
Defendant: Alex Azar, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health & Human Services and Alex Azar
Case Number: 3:2019cv00579
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service executed on 05/31/2019 as to US Attorney by Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Dilday, Amy) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit text.(TMC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Complaint by Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Shands Jacksonville HealthCare, Inc. for Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc... (Dilday, Amy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. of Pendency of Related Actions (Dilday, Amy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Alex Azar. (JSG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-579-J-32MCR. (SJB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Alex Azar, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health & Human Services (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15477725) filed by Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a UF Health Jacksonville. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dilday, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a UF Health Jacksonville
Represented By: Amy L. Dilday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Dilday
Represented By: Derek M. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?