Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00603
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc. (Marcell, Karen) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit text (PAM).
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lexington Insurance Company filed by Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Marcell, Karen) Modified on 7/18/2019 to edit text (PAM).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Substitute Attorney. Edward Ronsman, Esq., is hereby substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to terminate Geoffrey Lutz, Esq., as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/12/2019. (TSP)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc.. (Ronsman, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Complaint. Count II of the Complaint (Doc. 4) is DISMISSED without prejudice. On or before July 19, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/2/2019. (AEJ)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Marcell, Karen) Modified on 7/2/2019 to edit text (PAM).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Marcell, Karen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint filed by Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc.. (Marcell, Karen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint by Lexington Insurance Company. (Dornstein, Scott)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Lexington Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit B 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit B 3 of 3)(PAM)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-603-J-39JBT. (SJB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company (Dornstein, Scott) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (PAM).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit in and for St. Johns County, Florida, case number CA19-0418 filed in State Court on 3/29/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15492184 filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dornstein, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Reef Club Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Karen M. Marcell
Represented By: Geoffrey Lutz
Represented By: Edward Ronsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Dornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?