Jenkins v. Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC

Plaintiff: Jamon Jenkins
Defendant: Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00633
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (TMC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline is 6/5/2020; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 7/6/2020; Conduct mediation hearing by 7/24/2020; Pretrial statement due by 11/12/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; and, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 12/7/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report form, #2 docket sheet)(MD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Humphries, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICEof Jurisdictional Supplement, by Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC re 7 Order (Humphries, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2019 to edit text. (TMC)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER directing Defendant to file a supplementary notice by 6/17/19 stating Plaintiff's citizenship, as 28 U.S.C. section 1332 requires. The Notice of Removal only states Plaintiff's residency. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/3/2019. (SEJ)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER terminating #4 Motion to Set for trial; the Court will set the case for trial once it reviews the parties' forthcoming case management report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 6/3/2019.(SRW)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Set for Trial, by Jamon Jenkins. (Filed in State Court on 03/05/2019) (TMC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC. (Filed in State Court on 03/04/2019)(TMC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Jamon Jenkins. (Filed in State Court on 01/30/2019)(TMC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, case number 16-2019-CA-812 filed in State Court on 01/30/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number JAX030933 filed by Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composit Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Corning Roofing & Asphalt, LLC
Represented By: Michael Joyner Humphries
Represented By: Geddes Dowling Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamon Jenkins
Represented By: Caitlin Elizabeth O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?