Davis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: patricia davis
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00656
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Simonitsch, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Simonitsch, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 06/07/2019 by Patricia Davis as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Story, Max)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (JSG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-656-J-32PDB. (SJB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15534174) filed by patricia davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Story, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephen Allan McGuinness
Represented By: William John Simonitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: patricia davis
Represented By: Max H. Story
Represented By: Austin James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?