RapidDeploy, Inc. v. Kraus Associates, Inc.

Plaintiff: RapidDeploy, Inc.
Defendant: Kraus Associates, Inc. d/b/a AK Associates and Kraus Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00668
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by RapidDeploy, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion of Maximilian A. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff and Written Designation and Consent to Act Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02 and Memorandum of Law in Support. If Maximilian A. Grant, Esq., has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/10/2019. (TSP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Kraus Associates, Inc. (JSG)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by RapidDeploy, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
June 7, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Maximilian A. Grant, appearing on behalf of RapidDeploy, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031009.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Maximilian A. Grant to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by RapidDeploy, Inc. (Johnson, Daniel). Modified on 6/10/2019 to notify counsel's office to fix case number and re-file (JSG).
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (JSG)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Maximilian A. Grant to appear pro hac vice by RapidDeploy, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-668-J-32JBT. (SJB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by RapidDeploy, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by RapidDeploy, Inc. (Johnson, Daniel)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kraus Associates, Inc. d/b/a AK Associates with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15545751) filed by RapidDeploy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons)(Johnson, Daniel) Modified on 6/7/2019 to ask counsel's office to re-file summons without date filled in (JSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RapidDeploy, Inc. v. Kraus Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraus Associates, Inc. d/b/a AK Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraus Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RapidDeploy, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Johnson
Represented By: Maximilian A. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?