Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.104.9.11 and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00759
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of compliance re #11 Order on Motion to Quash by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Mamone, Tyler)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER taking under advisement #10 Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoena; Plaintiff shall have up to and including 8/22/2019 to serve this Order on Comcast; Comcast shall not provide Plaintiff with the name and address of the subscriber of the identified IP address until after the Motion is ruled upon; Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion within the time allowed by the Local Rules; if it wishes to, Comcast may respond to the Motion within the same timeframe; Plaintiff is reminded that it shall not seek issuance of a summons from the Clerk that names the Subscriber as Defendant and shall not file any identifying information regarding the Subscriber, until after the Motion is ruled upon. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/20/2019. (BHC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to quash Third Party Subpoena issued to Comcast by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena)(Kinnaman, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to the extent set forth in the Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/12/2019. (BHC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mamone, Tyler)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (TMC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-759-J-32JRK. (SJB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Mamone, Tyler)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Mamone, Tyler)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mamone, Tyler)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.104.9.11 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15614098) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mamone, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.104.9.11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Christopher J. Kinnaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tyler Mamone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?