Watts v. Townsquare Media Inc.
Plaintiff: Jared A. Watts
Defendant: Townsquare Media Inc. and Townsquare Media, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00860
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard. New case number: 3:19-cv-860-J-34JRK. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Honorable Marcia Morales Howard with her consent. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/16/2019. (AMP)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jared A. Watts. (Sheftall, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jared A. Watts. Related case(s): Yes (Sheftall, Scott)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Townsquare Media, Inc. (AEJ)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-860-J-39JRK. (SJB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Townsquare Media Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15720660) filed by Jared A. Watts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons) (Sheftall, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Townsquare Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsquare Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsquare Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared A. Watts
Represented By: Scott Dozier Sheftall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?