Pearce, D.P.M. v. Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.
Plaintiff: Beth Pearce, D.P.M.
Defendant: Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00875
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Stay and for Extension of Time. This case is stayed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case. Joint status report due January 17, 2020, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/20/2019. (JW)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 Order filed by Beth Pearce, D.P.M.. (Lockamy, Michael) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (BD).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER taking under advisement #12 Joint Motion to Stay and for Extension of Time. The parties are directed to show cause by a written response filed on or before September 18, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice rather than stayed at this time. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/5/2019. (JW)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to stay re #1 Complaint and for Extension of Time by Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hayden, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including 9/4/2019 to respond to the Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial Injunctive Relief Requested (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/21/2019. (MDC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-875-J-34JRK. Motion(s) REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (SJW)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/20/2019. (ADM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin D. Sharkey on behalf of Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A. (Sharkey, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.. (Hayden, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified text on 8/14/2019 (Notified counsel to use complete case number including judges codes on future filings) (BD).
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-875-J-34MCR. Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of recusal directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/30/2019. (ASL)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.. (BD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-875-J-34PDB. (SJB)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15735719) filed by Beth Pearce, D.P.M.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Lockamy, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #4 Exhibit A - Redacted) (BD). Modified on 7/29/2019 to replace Exhibit A with redacted PDF. (Notified counsel to redact personal identifiers on future filings) (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearce, D.P.M. v. Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Pearce, D.P.M.
Represented By: Michael E. Lockamy
Represented By: Michael E. Halkitis
Represented By: Scott Thomas Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopaedic Associates of St. Augustine, P.A.
Represented By: Brian Lee Hayden
Represented By: Benjamin D. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?