Cobb v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charlotte Cobb
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00897
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-5659, filed on 9/9/2019. (AFC)
September 9, 2019 Mail addressed to Counsel Kevin P. Sullivan marked return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward re: #7 Related case order and track 2 notice, #11 Order, #12 Order. (PAM) Modified on 9/9/2019 (PAM). Modified on 9/10/2019 (PAM). Left detailed message on counsel's phone regarding address
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (SJW)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand. filed by Charlotte Cobb. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Charlotte Cobb.(Sullivan, Kevin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Order to strike filed by Charlotte Cobb. (Sullivan, Kevin)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STRIKING #1 Complaint. No later than August 28, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consistent with the directives of this Order. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/14/2019. (AMP)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 and #10 Motions for Admission of Kevin P. Sullivan and Thomas N. Petersen Pro Hac Vice and Written Designations and Consents to Act. Kevin P. Sullivan and Thomas N. Petersen are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Christopher Shakib as local counsel. Mr. Sullivan and Mr. Petersen shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/14/2019. (MDC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Thomas N. Peterson to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Shakib, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Thomas A. Petersen to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Shakib, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 8/13/2019 (PAM). Counsel directed to refile pleading no signature on signature block. Chambers notified.
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Kevin P. Sullivan to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Shakib, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 12, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Thomas N. Petersen, appearing on behalf of Charlotte Cobb (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031451.). (AFC)
August 12, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kevin P. Sullivan, appearing on behalf of Charlotte Cobb (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031451.). (AFC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (BD)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Charlotte Cobb of Filing (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Shakib, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 as to Counsel Thomas N. Petersen (signed by deputy clerk). (PAM)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 as to Counsel Kevin P. Sullivan (signed by deputy clerk). (PAM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-897-J-39JRK. (SJB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15754987) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Shakib, Christopher) Modified on 8/2/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to refile summons Modified on 8/15/2019 (PAM). Stricken Per Order Doc. #12

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Cobb
Represented By: Christopher Shakib
Represented By: Thomas N. Petersen
Represented By: Kevin P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?