Leonard v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert Winchester Leonard
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00956
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (SJW)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF of service by Robert Winchester Leonard (Petosa, Frank)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (AEJ)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-956-J-39JBT. (NAS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15818608) filed by Robert Winchester Leonard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Petosa, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Winchester Leonard
Represented By: Frank Michael Petosa
Represented By: T. Michael Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?