Drover v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Douglas Drover
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01056
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:19-cv-6951, filed on 10/30/2019. (AFC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California. MDL case number: 2741 (SJW)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 9/30/2019 by Douglas Drover as to Monsanto Company. (Chambers, G.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Douglas Drover. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Douglas Drover. (Chambers, G.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (RH)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1056-J-34JRK. (SJB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15901069) filed by Douglas Drover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drover v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Drover
Represented By: G. Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?