United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Ring Power Corporation
Plaintiff: EEOC-Miami District Office Miami Tower and United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Ring Power Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01098
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint by Ring Power Corporation. (Feigel, Leonard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Ring Power Corporation.(Feigel, Leonard)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including November 12, 2019 to respond to the Complaint #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/30/2019. (TSP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ring Power Corporation. (Feigel, Leonard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Related case(s): no (Banks, Oshia)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Banks, Oshia)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Ring Power Corporation. (RH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-1098-J-34JBT. (SJB)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED Summons by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Banks, Oshia) Modified on 9/25/2019 to edit text (RH).
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ring Power Corporation with Jury Demand filed by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Banks, Oshia) Modified on 9/25/2019 to edit text (RH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Ring Power Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring Power Corporation
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin E. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC-Miami District Office Miami Tower
Represented By: Oshia Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Oshia Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?