Sarama v. Drug Enforcement Administration
Plaintiff: Mr. Daniel Sarama and Daniel Sarama
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration and United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv01116
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. All deadlines are stayed until further Order. No later than 12/20/19 the parties shall file a status report regarding record production and the resolution of this case. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/6/2019. (MD)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint and Stay Case Deadlines by United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (Gibbons, Shea) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Joint notice due within 30 days of the appearance of defendant. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to United States Drug Enforcement Administration. (JSG)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Daniel Sarama. (Bauer, Galen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1116-J-32JRK. (SJB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15973986) filed by Daniel Sarama (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bauer, Galen). Modified on 10/1/2019 to notify counsel's office to re-file proposed Summons with correct case number (JSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarama v. Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Shea Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Daniel Sarama
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sarama
Represented By: Galen D. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?