Wallace et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Welesley Wallace, Sally Wallace and Fabian Wallace
Defendant: David Pekoske, Lisa Bradley, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Donald Neufeld and Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 3:2019cv01314
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/11/2019. (MM)
December 10, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Abadir Jama Barre, appearing on behalf of Fabian Wallace, Sally Wallace, Welesley Wallace - see dkt. #7 (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032199.). (AFC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Welesley Wallace, Fabian Wallace, Sally Wallace.(LaGuerre-Maingrette, Shannon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Shannon Martine LaGuerre-Maingrette on behalf of Fabian Wallace, Sally Wallace, Welesley Wallace. Local Counsel: Shannon Laguerre-Maingratte. Non-Resident Counsel: Abadir Jama Barre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Abadir Jama Barre, Esq.)(LaGuerre-Maingrette, Shannon) Modified on 12/11/2019 to edit text (RH).
November 26, 2019 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended Complaint due by 12/6/2019 (RH)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER striking #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consistent with the directives of this Order on or before December 6, 2019. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/22/2019. (JMF)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Abadir Jama Barre of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Lisa Bradley, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Donald Neufeld, David Pekoske, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BD)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-1314-J-34MCR. (SJB)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Writ of Mandamus against Lisa Bradley, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Donald Neufeld, David Pekoske, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16129414) filed by Welesley Wallace, Fabian Wallace, Sally Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Lisa Bradley, #3 Proposed Summons Donald Neufeld, #4 Proposed Summons USCIS, #5 Proposed Summons Department of Homeland Security, #6 Proposed Summons David Pekoske, #7 Proposed Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli)(LaGuerre-Maingrette, Shannon) Modified on 11/26/2019 (STRICKEN per ORDER doc #6)(RH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pekoske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Neufeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welesley Wallace
Represented By: Shannon Martine LaGuerre-Maingrette
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Wallace
Represented By: Shannon Martine LaGuerre-Maingrette
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Wallace
Represented By: Shannon Martine LaGuerre-Maingrette
Represented By: Abadir Jama Barre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?