Brett v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Brett
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01327
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/04/2019 by Amazon.Com Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. as to All Defendants. (Zelek, Mark)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Amazon.Com Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Nancy Brett.(Cabassa, Luis)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consistent with the directives of this Order on or before December 9, 2019. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/18/2019. (MHM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Amazon.Com Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (BD)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-1327-J-34JBT. (SJB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Amazon.Com Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16146700) filed by Nancy Brett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Cabassa, Luis) Modified text on 11/19/2019. ***STRICKEN pursuant to Order #4 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brett v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Brett
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Represented By: Scott Michael Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?