Mitchell v. Dept. of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Mitchell
Defendant: Dept Of Corrections and New River C.I.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01328
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-24120. File received electronically
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Adopting #4 Report and Recommendations and Transferring Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd) [Transferred from flsd on 11/15/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by James Mitchell; Recommending that the Court transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/16/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from flsd on 11/15/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Mitchell. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 11/15/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 11/15/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Dept. of Corrections, New River C.I.. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by James Mitchell.(jao) [Transferred from flsd on 11/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Dept. of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept Of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New River C.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?