Mosley v. GC Wen FL, LLC
Plaintiff: Daimeon Mosley
Defendant: GC Wen FL, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01329
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice. The Clerk should close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/11/2019. (SEJ)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Daimeon Mosley (Weiss, Jason)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6, directing the parties to file a joint motion for dismissal or other appropriate documents to close out this file by 2/7/2020. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/9/2019. (SEJ)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of settlement by Daimeon Mosley (Weiss, Jason)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Bennett Marks on behalf of GC Wen FL, LLC (Marks, Geoffrey)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 and ADA Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to GC Wen FL, LLC. (KKH)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-1329-J-32MCR. (SJB)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GC Wen FL, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16148900) filed by Daimeon Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Weiss, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. GC Wen FL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC Wen FL, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Bennett Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daimeon Mosley
Represented By: Jason S. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?