Murr v. United States of America (IRS)
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Dawn Murr
Defendant: United States of America (IRS)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00042
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Case Stayed. (AEJ)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Koehler Ide on behalf of United States of America (IRS) (Ide, Carol)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings; directing the Clerk to administratively close this case; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/19/2020. (MGG)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to stay Proceedings by Elizabeth Dawn Murr. (Johnson, Keith)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Elizabeth Dawn Murr (Johnson, Keith)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-42-J-20PDB. (SJB)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (IRS) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16373278) filed by Elizabeth Dawn Murr.(Johnson, Keith) Modified on 1/22/2020 - notified counsel regarding civil cover sheet. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murr v. United States of America (IRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Dawn Murr
Represented By: Keith Howard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America (IRS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?