PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. Black Knight, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan services LLC
Defendant: Black Knight, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2020cv00148
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File All Upcoming Case Documents and Deadlines by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (Davis, Thad)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #53,#54 Black Knight's unopposed motion asking the Court to allow Jonathan Gleklen and Eric Shapland to specially appear to represent it in this case and directing them to register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 3/9/2020. (ASL)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #48,#49,#50, #51, #55, #56, #57 the plaintiff's unopposed motion asking the Court to allow Richard Gottlieb, Barry Lee, Yasser El-Gamal, Reid Davis, Joshua Lipton, James Zelenay, and Thad Davis to specially appear to represent it in this case and directing them to register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 3/9/2020. (ASL)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Richard E. Gottlieb, appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032705.) Related document: #48 MOTION for Richard E. Gottlieb to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Barry W. Lee, appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032705.) Related document: #49 MOTION for Barry W. Lee to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Thad Alan Davis, appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032704.) Related document: #57 MOTION for Thad Alan Davis to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney James L. Zelenay, Jr., appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032704.) Related document: #56 MOTION for James L. Zelenay, Jr. to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joshua Lipton, appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032704.) Related document: #55 MOTION for Joshua Lipton to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Reid Davis, appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032705.) Related document: #51 MOTION for Reid Davis to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Yasser M. El-Gamal, appearing on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032705.) Related document: #50 MOTION for Yasser M. El-Gamal to appear pro hac vice . (AFC)
March 3, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE to counsel Joshua Lipton, Reid Davis,James L. Zelenay, Thad Alan Davis of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
March 2, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Thad Alan Davis to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
March 2, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for James L. Zelenay, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
March 2, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Joshua Lipton to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
March 2, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Eric Shapland, appearing on behalf of Black Knight, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032696.). (KKH)
March 2, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathan I. Gleklen, appearing on behalf of Black Knight, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032695.). (KKH)
February 28, 2020 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Eric Shapland to appear pro hac vice by Black Knight, Inc.. (Horovitz, Samuel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
February 28, 2020 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan I. Gleklen to appear pro hac vice by Black Knight, Inc.. (Horovitz, Samuel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
February 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Joseph Horovitz on behalf of Black Knight, Inc. (Horovitz, Samuel)
February 28, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Reid Davis to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
February 28, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Yasser M. El-Gamal to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
February 28, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Barry W. Lee to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
February 28, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Richard E. Gottlieb to appear pro hac vice by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER granting the parties' motion to extend the deadline for Black Knight to respond to the complaint. Black Knight must respond to the complaint by April 13, 2020. If PennyMac files an amended complaint by that deadline, Black Knight instead must respond to the amended complaint within 30 days of its filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/28/2020. (SEJ)
February 27, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Black Knight's response to the complaint by Pennymac Loan services LLC. (George, Christian)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Mark Holscher, Tammy Tsoumas, James Mutchnik, Russell Levine, and Kirkland & Ellis LLP's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff, and directing the clerk to modify the docket accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/24/2020. (SEJ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 3 (MGG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to withdraw as counsel by Pennymac Loan services LLC (George, Christian) Modified text/event on 2/21/2020. (AEJ)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER notifying the plaintiff that counsel must file a motion to withdraw that accords with Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 2/20/2020. (SEJ)
February 19, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Pennymac Loan services LLC (George, Christian) Modified text on 2/20/2020. (AEJ)
February 18, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence D. Silverman on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Silverman, Lawrence)
February 17, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Heller on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (Heller, William)
February 17, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian P. George on behalf of Pennymac Loan services LLC (George, Christian)
February 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE to counsel Richard E. Gottlieb, Yasser M. El-Gamal, James H. Mutchnik, Mark C. Holscher, Russell E. Levine, Tammy Ann Tsoumas, Barry W. Lee, Carl Alan Roth, David Eric Shapland, Jonathan I. Gleklen, Matthew Lawrence Venezia, and Eric M. George of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MAA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 36 TRANSFER IN from the Central District of California. Case assigned to District Judge Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Barksdale. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-148-J-20PDB. (MAA)
February 14, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-09526. File received electronically
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #25); Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (DE #26) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue and transfers this action to the Middle District of Florida. The Court DENIES as moot Defendant's Motionto Dismiss. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case #25, and Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida #26, calendared for hearing on February 10, 2020, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division #26 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and to Strike Counts 3-5 Pursuant to Cal. Code. Civ. Pro. Section 425.16#25 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division #26 filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Transfer)(Lee, Barry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and to Strike Counts 3-5 Pursuant to Cal. Code. Civ. Pro. Section 425.16#25 filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Lee, Barry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case #25 and Motion to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida #26, filed on 01/02/2020 and noticed for hearing on 03/09/2020 at 9:00 am, HAVE BEEN ADVANCED TO 02/10/2020 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for May 4, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. (sw) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #5 Declaration of Eric M. George in Support of Motion to Transfer, #6 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Transfer, #7 Exhibit D to the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Transfer, #8 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer) (George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and to Strike Counts 3-5 Pursuant to Cal. Code. Civ. Pro. Section 425.16 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Michael L. Gravelle, #5 Declaration of Eric M. George in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Supplement Request for Judicial in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit D to the Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #8 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney James H Mutchnik APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintifff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, designating Tammy Ann Tsoumas as local counsel. (et) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Russell E. Levine APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, designating Tammy A. Tsoumas as local counsel. (et) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc. identifying Black Knight, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James H. Mutchnik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24956904) filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney (James H. Mutchnik) to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tsoumas, Tammy) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Russell E. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24956702) filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney (Russell E. Levine) to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tsoumas, Tammy) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Tsoumas, Tammy) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark C Holscher on behalf of Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Holscher, Mark) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carl Alan Roth on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (Attorney Carl Alan Roth added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roth, Carl) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Lawrence Venezia counsel for Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. Adding Matthew L. Venezia as counsel of record for Black Knight, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew Lawrence Venezia added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Venezia, Matthew) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Ian Gleklen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc., designating David Eric Shapland as local counsel. (et) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
December 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND BLACK NIGHT, INC.'S RESPONSE DATE TO JANUARY 6, 2020 #13 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (et) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Amended STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Black Knight, Inc. answer now due 1/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)#1 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response)(George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Black Knight, Inc. answer now due 1/1/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)#1 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc..(George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan I. Gleklen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/25/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24845927) filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Shapland, David) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan I. Gleklen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24845927) filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David Eric Shapland added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Shapland, David) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Black Knight, Inc. answer now due 11/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)#1 filed by Defendant Black Knight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response)(Attorney Eric M George added to party Black Knight, Inc.(pty:dft))(George, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)#1 as to Defendant Black Knight, Inc. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, (Lee, Barry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)#1 filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Lee, Barry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Lee, Barry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24733597 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Barry W Lee added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:pla))(Lee, Barry) [Transferred from cacd on 2/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC v. Black Knight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennymac Loan services LLC
Represented By: Barry W Lee
Represented By: Richard E Gottlieb
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Represented By: Russell Levine
Represented By: Yasser M El-Gamal
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: James H Mutchnik
Represented By: Lawrence D. Silverman
Represented By: Joshua Lipton
Represented By: Christian P. George
Represented By: Reid Davis
Represented By: James L. Zelenay, Jr.
Represented By: Thad Alan Davis
Represented By: William P. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Knight, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Venezia
Represented By: David Eric Shapland
Represented By: Carl Alan Roth
Represented By: Eric M George
Represented By: Jonathan I Gleklen
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Horovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?