Yes Communites WFC, LLC. v. Shields
Plaintiff: Yes Communities WFC, LLC.
Defendant: Jamall Shields
Case Number: 3:2020cv00221
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to show cause as to Jamall Shields. Response due 5/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/24/2020. (ADM)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER taking under advisement #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Defendant's compliance due April 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/24/2020. (ADM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jamall Shields. (RH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Florida, case number 16-2020-CC-002686 filed in State Court on 2/24/20. filed by Jamall Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yes Communites WFC, LLC. v. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamall Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yes Communities WFC, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?