Wacko's Too, Inc. et al v. City of Jacksonville et al
Plaintiff: Chelsea Gallagher, Rebecca Anderson, Maria D's Inc., Esfund, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Whites Place LLC, MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, Neva Clinkscale, Wacko's Too, Inc., MT Productions, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, Patmilt, Inc., M & G Safar Inc., Bare Assets, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Horton Enterprises, Inc., Maria D's Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Bottomz Up, Big B Ranch, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Cocktails Showbar and Lounge, MT Productions, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Thee Officers Club, Kassab Nightlife LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Centerfold Lounge, Esfund, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Gold Rush, MHHS-Sinsations, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Sinsations, J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as SOS Lounge, Wacko's Too, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Wacko's, Whites Place LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Gold Club Jacksonville, M & G Safar Inc. a Florida coporation doing business as Gate's Gentleman's Club, Horton Enterprises, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as The New Solid Gold and Patmilt, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Passions
Defendant: N. O. Archbold, City of Jacksonville and Mike Williams
Case Number: 3:2020cv00303
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #39 Order filed by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Edinger, Gary)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER following TRIAL: Permanent injunctive relief will be granted as to Counts I, III, and XIII; denied as to Counts XI and XIV; granted in part, denied in part, and deferred in part as to Count II; granted in part and denied in part as to Count VIII; and deferred as to Counts IV, V, VI, and VII. Sections 150.224 and 151.214 of Ordinance 2020-74-E of the Jacksonville Municipal Code are facially unconstitutional under the First and Fourteenth Amendments; Sections 150.212(b) and 151.208(e) are facially invalid under Article V Section 2(a) of the Florida Constitution; and Sections 150.606(e) and 150.606(f) are facially unconstitutional in part under the First and Fourteenth Amendments. The City of Jacksonville will be permanently enjoined from enforcing these provisions, as stated in this Order. A Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction capturing these rulings will be entered at the conclusion of the case. Plaintiffs shall file an additional brief of no more than twenty-five (25) pages addressing the deferred Counts no later than 4/1/2021, and Defendants shall file a response of no more than twenty-five (25) pages no later than 4/30/2021. The parties shall jointly submit a case management plan as to the issues to be addressed at the reconvened trial, including a description of the necessary pretrial preparations and a proposed timeline, no later than 5/14/2021. The Clerk shall terminate #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (TNM)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of supplemental authority in support of Count I of their complaint (prior Restraint) re #23 Trial Brief by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Beach Advertising, LLC v. City of Treasure Island, Florida)(Edinger, Gary) (Modified on 1/15/2021 to edit docket text) (JDR).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop, RDR, CRR, CRC; dsmabishop@yahoo.com. (SB)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Bench Trial held on September 18, 2020 before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon M. Bishop, RDR, CRR, CRC; dsmabishop@yahoo.com,Telephone number (904)549-1307. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 10/30/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2021. (SB)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ENTRY. Proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan: BENCH TRIAL held on 9/18/2020. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop. (MD)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Stephen Gallaher by City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams re #25 Response (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Gallaher)(Teal, Jason) Modified to edit text on 9/18/2020 (KKH).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Amended NOTICE of Filing Declaration of William Clement III by City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams re #25 Response (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Clement III)(Teal, Jason) Modified to edit text on 9/18/2020 (KKH).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of William Clement III by City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams re #25 Response (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Clement III)(Teal, Jason) Modified to edit text on 9/18/2020 (KKH).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER resetting zoom trial to be an in-person proceeding in Courtroom 10D (trial remains set for 9/18/2020 at 9:30 a.m.); see order and attachment for coronavirus protocols. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit courthouse protocols)(SRW)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Documents in Support of Doc #25 and #29 by City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams re #25 Response (Attachments: #1 Main Document Declaration of Leanna Cumber, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A and Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - COJ_0001 to 0121, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - COJ_0122 to 0213, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - COJ_0214 to 0271, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - COJ_0272 to 0326, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A - COJ_0327 to 0391, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - COJ_0392 to 0528)(Teal, Jason) Modified to edit text on 8/21/2020 (KKH).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DEFENDANT'S SUR-REPLY on Agreed Legal Issues re #23 and #28 filed by N. O. Archbold, City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams. (Teal, Jason) Modified to edit text on 7/31/2020 (KKH).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF on Agreed Legal Issues by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Edinger, Gary) Modified to edit text on 7/16/2020 (KKH).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING BENCH TRIAL AND CONVERTING BENCH TRIAL TO VIDEOCONFERENCE: The bench trial previously scheduled for 8/18/2020 will now take place by Zoom videoconference on 9/18/2020 at 9:30 AM. The #19 Order setting dates and deadlines otherwise remains in place. See Notice for details. (TNM)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE HEARING: Telephone status conference set for 7/14/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. See Notice for details. (TNM)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE re #23 Trial Brief filed by City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams. (Teal, Jason)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Margaret Giannini on behalf of City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams (Giannini, Mary Margaret)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRIAL BRIEF of Agreed Legal Issues by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Natalie Sanchez)(Edinger, Gary) Modified to edit text on 6/8/2020 (KKH).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Bench Trial previously scheduled for 8/14/2020 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: 8/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (JJB) Modified to edit text on 6/1/2020 (KKH).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION and Response to Expedited Scheduling Order by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Edinger, Gary) Modified to edit text on 5/22/2020 (KKH).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting dates and deadlines. Parties' joint submission on counts to be handled on expedited basis and City's agreement of non-enforcement due by 5/21/2020; Plaintiffs' brief due by 6/5/2020; Defendants' response due by 7/2/2020; Plaintiffs' reply due by 7/16/2020; Defendants' sur-reply due by 7/30/2020; non-jury trial set for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 a.m. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/15/2020. (JJB)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY. Proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan: Telephone status conference held on 5/14/2020. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop. (MD)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Club Madonna v. Miami Beach - Supplemental Authority)(Edinger, Gary)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting these cases for a telephonic status conference on 5/14/2020 at 2:00 p.m. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 4/28/2020. (JJB)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT of Chelsea Gallagher re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chelsea Gallagher in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Edinger, Gary) Modified to edit text on 4/14/2020 (KKH).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriella Young on behalf of N. O. Archbold (Young, Gabriella)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig D. Feiser on behalf of City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams (Feiser, Craig)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Teal on behalf of City of Jacksonville, Mike Williams (Teal, Jason)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/9/2020 by N. O. Archbold as to N. O. Archbold. (Young, Gabriella)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/9/2020 by Mike Williams as to Mike Williams. (Teal, Jason)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/9/2020 by City of Jacksonville as to City of Jacksonville. (Teal, Jason)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC (Edinger, Gary) Modified to edit text on 4/9/2020 (KKH).
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rebecca Anderson, Bare Assets, Inc., Big B Ranch, Inc., Neva Clinkscale, Esfund, Inc., Chelsea Gallagher, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc., Kassab Nightlife LLC, M & G Safar Inc., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT Productions, Inc., Maria D's Inc., Patmilt, Inc., Natalie Sanchez, Wacko's Too, Inc., Whites Place LLC. (Edinger, Gary)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (KKH)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:20-cv-303-J-32MCR. (SJB)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for oral argument re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by REBECCA ANDERSON, BARE ASSETS, INC., BIG B RANCH, Inc., NEVA CLINKSCALE, Esfund, Inc., CHELSEA GALLAGHER, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J. R. LOUNGE OF JAX, INC., KASSAB NIGHTLIFE LLC, M & G SAFAR INC., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT PRODUCTIONS, INC., Maria D's Inc., PATMILT, INC., Natalie Sanchez, WHITES PLACE LLC, Wacko's Too, Inc.. (Edinger, Gary)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing AFFIDAVIT of Harvey Shuman in Support of re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by REBECCA ANDERSON, BARE ASSETS, INC., BIG B RANCH, Inc., NEVA CLINKSCALE, Esfund, Inc., CHELSEA GALLAGHER, Horton Enterprises, Inc., J. R. LOUNGE OF JAX, INC., KASSAB NIGHTLIFE LLC, M & G SAFAR INC., MHHS-Sinsations, LLC, MT PRODUCTIONS, INC., Maria D's Inc., PATMILT, INC., Natalie Sanchez, WHITES PLACE LLC, Wacko's Too, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Harvey Shuman in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Edinger, Gary) Modified to edit text on 3/26/2020 (KKH).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Preliminary Injuncton)(Edinger, Gary)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16636059) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ordinance 2020-74-E, #2 Exhibit April 20, 2004 Final Order entered in Wacko's Too, Inc., #3 Exhibit Sheriff's NTA Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons City of Jacksonville, #6 Proposed Summons Sheriff Williams, #7 Proposed Summons Archbold)(Edinger, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wacko's Too, Inc. et al v. City of Jacksonville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Gallagher
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Anderson
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D's Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esfund, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big B Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whites Place LLC
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHHS-Sinsations, LLC
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neva Clinkscale
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wacko's Too, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT Productions, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassab Nightlife LLC
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patmilt, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M & G Safar Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bare Assets, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Sanchez
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horton Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria D's Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Bottomz Up
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big B Ranch, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Cocktails Showbar and Lounge
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT Productions, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Thee Officers Club
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassab Nightlife LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Centerfold Lounge
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esfund, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Gold Rush
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHHS-Sinsations, LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Sinsations
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. Lounge of Jax, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as SOS Lounge
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wacko's Too, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Wacko's
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whites Place LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as Gold Club Jacksonville
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M & G Safar Inc. a Florida coporation doing business as Gate's Gentleman's Club
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horton Enterprises, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as The New Solid Gold
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patmilt, Inc. a Florida corporation doing business as Passions
Represented By: James S. Benjamin
Represented By: Gary S. Edinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. O. Archbold
Represented By: Gabriella Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jacksonville
Represented By: Jason R. Teal
Represented By: Craig D. Feiser
Represented By: Mary Margaret Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Williams
Represented By: Jason R. Teal
Represented By: Craig D. Feiser
Represented By: Mary Margaret Giannini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?