Jones et al v. Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Uriah Jones and Amber Lacinak-Jones
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc., Ascension Health Co. dba St. Vincent's Medical Center Riverside, Ascension Health Co. and Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00342
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by June 5, 2020, and denying as moot #12 the motion to strike the original complaint. #14 The motion to remand is deemed withdrawn, and the clerk is directed to notate the docket accordingly. The deadline to conduct a case management conference and file a case management report is stayed until further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/27/2020. (SEJ)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry for the telephone conference held on 5/22/2020 before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale: The plaintiffs agreed the Court has subject-matter jurisdiction as the action is currently pleaded, and withdrew #14 the motion to remand. Without objection from Messrs. McDonough and Giarratana, Judge Barksdale directed the plaintiffs to file an amended complaint by 6/5/2020. Judge Barksdale advised the parties that the requirement to conduct a case management conference and file a case management report is stayed until the Court reviews the amended complaint. (Digital) (ASL)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER rescheduling the telephone conference to 5/22/2020 at 02:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5 B before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. The plaintiffs and counsel must appear by telephone by calling (888) 684-8852 at least five minutes before the proceeding. The access code is 1103539; the security code is 0004. The parties should carefully review the order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/14/2020. (ASL)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 the plaintiffs' motion requesting permission to access the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/13/2020. (ASL)
May 13, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry for the telephone conference held on 5/13/2020 before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale: Because the plaintiffs were not present, Judge Barksdale will enter an order rescheduling the telephone conference. (Digital) (ASL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Giovanni P. Giarratana on behalf of Ascension Health Co. (Giarratana, Giovanni)
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Paul Mehta on behalf of Ascension Health Co. (Mehta, Jason)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Strike #3 Complaint filed by Uriah Jones, Amber Lacinak-Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(PAM) Modified on 5/6/2020 (PAM). Pro Se notified to redact personal identifiers e.g. dates of births and Social Security Numbers, and to use entire case number
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Uriah Jones, Amber Lacinak-Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(KKH)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically titled, Plaintiff's Motion for E-filing by Uriah Jones, Amber Lacinak-Jones. (KKH) Modified to removed quotation marks on docket text on 5/7/2020 (KKH).
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #3 Complaint by Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDonough, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order pdf filed by Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McDonough, James)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc.. Related case(s): n (McDonough, James)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc. (McDonough, James) Modified on 4/22/2020 to edit text (PAM).
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a telephone conference to discuss amendment of #3 the complaint to name the correct Quicken entity for 5/13/2020 at 2:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5B before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. The plaintiffs and counsel must appear by telephone by calling (888) 684-8852 at least five minutes before the proceeding. The access code is 1103539; the security code is 0004. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/22/2020. (SEJ)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the plaintiffs to advise the Court whether they agree that Quicken Loans, Inc., is the proper name of the party by April 21, 2020. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/7/2020. (SEJ)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to the plaintiffs of procedural rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/7/2020. (SEJ)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: Defendant Quicken Loans shall have up to and including April 27, 2020, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has jurisdiction over this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/6/2020. (MAM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ascension Health Co., Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Uriah Jones, Amber Lacinak-Jones.(PAM) Filed in State Court on 3/4/2020
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-342-J-34PDB. (SJB)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial Court - Duval County, case number 16-2020-CA-001369 filed in State Court on 03/04/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16663852 filed by Quicken Loans Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Ex. B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D)(McDonough, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriah Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Lacinak-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: James Kirby McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Health Co. dba St. Vincent's Medical Center Riverside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Health Co.
Represented By: Giovanni P. Giarratana
Represented By: Jason Paul Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: James Kirby McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?