Cartategui v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Cartategui
Defendant: Walgreens Co. and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00380
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AEJ)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediator selection due by 12/30/2020; Discovery due by 6/4/2021; Conduct mediation hearing by 7/1/2021; Dispositive motions due by 7/9/2021; Pretrial statement due by 11/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 12/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bartoszek, Peter)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Walgreens Co. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy Inc., Corporate Parent Walgreen Co, Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Corporate Parent CVS Health Corp., Corporate Parent Holiday CVS, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Joseph B. Stokes, Other Affiliate Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy & Ford, Other Affiliate Saalfield Shad, P.A., Other Affiliate Mitchell Stone, Other Affiliate Nicole Cartategui, Other Affiliate Joseph Menello, Other Affiliate Peter Bartoszek for Walgreens Co... (Stokes, Joseph)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Nicole Cartategui. (Stone, Mitchell)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law filed by Nicole Cartategui. (Stone, Mitchell)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: On or before May 21, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a response to #2 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Failure to respond will lead to the dismissal of this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/12/2020. (AMP)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Bartoszek, Peter)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement for Holiday CVS, L.L.C. by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Bartoszek, Peter)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bartoszek on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Bartoszek, Peter)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 3/24/2020) against CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Walgreens Co. with Jury Demand. filed by Nicole Cartategui.(AEJ)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-380-J-39JBT. (SJB)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2020-CA-000423-XXXX-MA filed in State Court on 1/23/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16697836 filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, #2 State Court COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal)(Menello, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartategui v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Represented By: Joseph B. Stokes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Menello
Represented By: Peter Bartoszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Cartategui
Represented By: Mitchell A. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?