Oestriecher et al v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Plaintiff: Kurt Oestriecher and Sandy Oestriecher
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00412
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kane, Julie)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company identifying Corporate Parent SRI USA, Inc. for Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.. (McDonald, Francis)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(McDonald, Francis)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Count VII of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pltf's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Mtn to Dismiss Count VII of Pltf's Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Pltf's Resp to Def's DE 9 MTD, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(McDonald, Francis)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Waiver of the Service of Summons as to Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kane, Julie). Modified on 5/6/2020 to edit text (JSG).
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Waiver of the Service of Summons as to The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kane, Julie). Modified on 5/6/2020 to edit text (JSG).
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher. (Kane, Julie)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kurt Oestriecher, Sandy Oestriecher. Related case(s): Yes (Kane, Julie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (JSG)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-412-J-32PDB. (SJB)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16727396) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Kane, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oestriecher et al v. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Oestriecher
Represented By: Julie Braman Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Oestriecher
Represented By: Julie Braman Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?