Bantag v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bianca Bantag
Defendant: John Doe and Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00472
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Show Cause re #11 Order filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Stokes, Brian) Modified on 6/19/2020 to edit text (PAM).
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #9 Amended Complaint by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Stokes, Brian) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit text (PAM).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc. to identify Defendant Eddy Marcena's state of citizenship and show cause by June 19, 2020, why the Court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/8/2020. (MAM)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Eddy Marcena. (RH)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Werner Enterprises, Inc., Eddy Marcena with Jury Demand. filed by Bianca Bantag. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Bianca Bantag.(Andeer, Eric)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Bianca Bantag. (Andeer, Eric)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking #3 Plaintiff's Complaint; directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before June 2, 2020; denying as moot #5 The Motion of Defendant, Werner Enterprises, Inc., to Dismiss with Prejudice and/or Strike Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/12/2020. (MAM)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice and/or Strike Count II of Plaintiff's #3 Complaint by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (PAM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 5/8/2020 (PAM). Originally filed in State Court on 2/4/2020
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (PAM) Originally filed in State Court on 2/4/2020
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Werner Enterprises, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Bianca Bantag.(PAM) Originally filed in State Court on 10/18/2019 Modified on 5/13/2020 (PAM). Stricken Per Order Doc #7
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:20-cv-472-J-34PDB. (SJB)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, in and for St. Johns County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-001543 filed in State Court on 10/18/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16789711 filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 State Court ANSWER Exhibit D - State Court Answer, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibits B, C, E-J, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bantag v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Pedro Raul Alvarez, Jr.
Represented By: Brian David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Bantag
Represented By: Eric Randolph Andeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?