Norton v. PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Kathleen Norton
Defendant: PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00495
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER discharging #15 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/30/2020. (JW)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #15 Order to show cause by PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC. (Achem, Sami)
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC. (Achem, Sami) Modified on 6/23/2020 to edit text (PAM).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed due to Defendant's failure to comply with this Court's Orders regarding the filing of a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/19/2020. (JW) Modified on 6/30/2020 (PAM). Discharged Per Order Doc. 18 Modified on 7/1/2020 (PAM). Discharged Per Order Doc. 18
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE to counsel Catheline Jessica Georges of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM) Modified on 6/16/2020 to edit text (PAM).
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to counsel John Steven Holzbaur of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kathleen Norton. (Nowicki, Kristopher) Modified on 6/16/2020 to edit text (PAM).
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (PAM)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements due 6/12/2020. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/26/2021. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive motions due by 5/14/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Achem, Sami) Modified on 6/8/2020 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings.
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing state court docket sheet by PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Achem, Sami) Modified on 5/20/2020 to edit text (PAM).
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsels Samie Achem and Victoria Merritt of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Victoria Merritt of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC.(PAM) Originally filed in State Court on 3/19/20
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Kathleen Norton.(PAM)Originally filed in State Court on 2/25/20
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-495-J-34JBT. (SJB)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, case number 2020-CA-1129 filed in State Court on 05/15/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16820065 filed by PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5State Court Civil Cover Sheet)(Achem, Sami) Modified on 5/19/2020 (PAM). Counsel directed to refile the state court docket sheet

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PGP Jacksonville Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?