Hudspeth v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa D. Hudspeth
Defendant: Selena M. Mitseas, Chris J. Bostain, Selena M. Lessa, Gregory L. Prine, C. R. Bard, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ryan P. Mckeon, Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, Inc. and David Montgomery Jackson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00529
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 163 Joint NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson re #161 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Preston, Amanda) (Modified docket text on 6/26/2020) (KEM).
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ENDORSED ORDER granting #158 #159 #160 Unopposed Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. If attorneys Erin M. Wood, Christopher L. Johnson, and Leslie MacLean have not already done so, they each shall immediately pay the admission fee and register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/12/2020. (TAM)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER directing the parties to file on or before June 25, 2020, a joint notice as to the posture of this case and any outstanding issues requiring resolution before trial. The Clerk shall terminate all motions that were pending before the transfer of this case. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/12/2020. (AMP)
June 11, 2020 Filing 160 MOTION for Leslie MacLean to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16923986 for $150 by Lisa D. Hudspeth. (Culpepper, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 11, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION for Christopher L. Johnson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16923973 for $150 by Lisa D. Hudspeth. (Culpepper, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 11, 2020 Filing 158 MOTION for Erin M. Wood to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16923926 for $150 by Lisa D. Hudspeth. (Culpepper, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 11, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Chadwell Culpepper on behalf of Lisa D. Hudspeth (Culpepper, Robert) (Modified docket text on 6/18/2020) (KEM).
June 11, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Chadwell Culpepper on behalf of Lisa D. Hudspeth (Culpepper, Robert) (Modified docket text on 6/18/2020) (KEM).
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's case as to Defendant Ethicon, LLC. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Ethicon, LLC from the Court docket. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/3/2020. (AMP)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENDORSED ORDER granting #151 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw MDL Counsel of Record. Attorneys William M. Gage, Kari L. Sutherland, Caroline Dye Walker, Susan M. Robinson, Halli D. Cohn, S. Eric Rumanek, and Patricia E. Lowry are hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants. The Clerk is directed to terminate these attorneys as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/2/2020. (TAM)
June 1, 2020 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc... (Preston, Amanda)
June 1, 2020 Filing 152 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Ethicon LLC by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Preston, Amanda) (Modified docket text on 6/2/2020) (KEM).
June 1, 2020 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for William Gage, Kari L. Sutherland, Caroline Dye Walker, SUsan M. Robinson, Halli D. Cohn, S. Eric Rumanek and Patricia E. Lowry to Withdraw as Attorney by Ethicon, Inc.. (Preston, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 1, 2020 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Elizabeth Preston on behalf of Ethicon, LLC (Preston, Amanda)
May 28, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE to counsel Erin M. Wood; Leslie C. MacLean; Rachel A. Gross; Charles S. Siegel; Lori G. Cohen; Richard B. North, Jr.; Christy D. Jones; David B. Thomas; Halli D. Cohn; S. Eric Rumanek; Caroline Dye Walker; Kari L. Sutherland; William M. Gage of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KEM)
May 28, 2020 Filing 148 TRANSFER IN from the West Virginia Southern. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-00529-J39JBT. (KEM)
May 27, 2020 Filing 147 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-04163. File received electronically
May 27, 2020 Filing 146 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: copy remanding Hudspeth v. Ethicon, Inc., et al. to the USDC/FLM and Orr et al v. Ethicon, Inc., et al. case to the USDC/TNE; the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in the civil actions have been completed and that remand to the transferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a), is appropriate; these actions are remanded to the transferor court. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/27/2020. (cc: attys) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 145 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) - Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) - Pls' Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) - Pls' Reply to Notice of Adoption of Resp of Thomas Wright, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 144 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply In Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 143 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6857) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (6972) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (7113) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 142 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2014) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2018) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2138) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jamie Sepulveda-Toro, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2138) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jamie Sepulveda-Toro, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2225) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (4495) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6849) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6990) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7141) - Notice of Adoption of Pl's Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jaime Sepulveda-Toro)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 141 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3672) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Parker, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3672) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Parker, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3672) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Parker, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3674) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Parker, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3747) Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Brian Parker, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3858) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Parker, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6828) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot of Brian Parker, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7011) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Brian Parker, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7104) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude of Brian Parker)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 140 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 139 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 138 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 137 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 136 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) - Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 135 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #134 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 134 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/21/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and the Rules for Multidistrict Litigation, the court suggests that the cases on Exhibit A be remanded to the courts from which they came, as identified on the attached Exhibit A; on or before 5/21/2020 the parties are directed to confer and to file in this case, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the court directs that upon receipt and filing of an order to remand from the Clerk of the JPMDL, the Clerk shall remand the case to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; on the Transfer Date, the Clerk is directed to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract the cases on Exhibit A and remand them to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A; after remand of the cases, the Clerk is directed to formally close the cases and strike them from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; cases on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying as moot #111 MOTION by David Montgomery Jackson, Selena M. Mitseas, Gregory L. Prine for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/7/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 131 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lisa D. Hudspeth (Wood, Erin) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #69 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Lisa D. Hudspeth TO TRANSFER this member case from MDL 2187 C. R. Bard to MDL 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/22/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS GREGORY L. PRINE, SELENA M. MISTEAS AND DAVID MONTGOMERY JACKSON/ORDER Defendants Gregory L. Prine, Selena M. Misteas and David Montgomery Jackson only are dismissed in this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/9/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE/ORDER Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Ryan P. Mckeon only are dismissed with prejudice in this action pursuant to the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each party to bear it own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/9/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 124 REPLY by Lisa D. Hudspeth to #119 Response In Opposition. (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 123 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #121 Response In Opposition. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 122 EXHIBITS by Lisa D. Hudspeth in support of #121 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 121 RESPONSE by Lisa D. Hudspeth in opposition to #115 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Gross, Rachel) (Modified on 10/29/2018 to remove link to Memorandum)(slr). (Modified on 10/29/2018 to replace main image and to correct link to #115 motion)(ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM by Lisa D. Hudspeth in opposition to #113 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. Ie-Ming Shih. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wood, Erin) (Modified text on 10/26/2018) (slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 119 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc. in opposition to #117 MOTION by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Ethicon, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Lisa Hudspeth Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Lisa Hudspeth Deposition, #3 Exhibit Jaime Sepulveda MD Expert Report, #4 Exhibit Ex D Letter to Susan Lin, #5 Exhibit Ex E Declaration of Reynaldo Librojo, #6 Exhibit Ex F - Letter to John Paulson, #7 Exhibit Ex G - Letter to Gregory Jones, #8 Exhibit Ex H - Letter to Sean O'Bryan, #9 Exhibit Ex I - Clearance Letter, #10 Exhibit Ex J - 510(k) Guidance, #11 Exhibit Ex K - Perry Trial Transcript)(Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 118 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendants Gregory Prine, Selena M. Misteas, and David Montgomery Jackson by David Montgomery Jackson, Selena M. Mitseas, Gregory L. Prine, Lisa D. Hudspeth, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) (Modified on 10/26/2018 to add party filer) (lca). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Ethicon, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Gross, Rachel) (Modified document title on 10/19/2018) (slr). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #115 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lisa Hudspeth Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit Excerpted Transcript of Deposition of Dr. Chen, #3 Exhibit Excerpted Transcript of Deposition of Lisa Hudspeth)(Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #113 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. Ie-Ming Shih. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case-Specific Opinions of Dr. Ie-Ming Shih. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 10/5/18 Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 10/4/18 Deposition Excerpts)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by David Montgomery Jackson, Selena M. Mitseas, Gregory L. Prine in support of #111 MOTION by David Montgomery Jackson, Selena M. Mitseas, Gregory L. Prine for Summary Judgment (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION by David Montgomery Jackson, Selena M. Mitseas, Gregory L. Prine for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lisa Hudspeth Plaintiff Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit Lisa Hudspeth Deposition, #3 Exhibit Dr Chen Deposition)(Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #97 EMERGENCY MOTION by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Protective Order as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/4/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying the Emergency Motion by Certain Plaintiffs for Protective Order filed at ECF No. 6714 in MDL 2327 and the Emergency Motion by Certain Plaintiffs for Protective Order filed at ECF No. 6716 in MDL 2327 as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/4/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; 15-04163 Hudspeth; 13-26198 Repka; 14-17889 Siegrist; 13-12954 Townson; 13-24530 Jacobsen; 13-24531 Kmiec; 13-24573 Murray; 13-19758 Rapacki) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Lisa D. Hudspeth of #97 EMERGENCY MOTION by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Protective Order (Gross, Rachel) (Modified on 10/3/2018 to add link to #97 motion) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 107 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Ie-Ming Shih, MD on October 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) (Modified on 10/5/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 106 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Ie-Ming Shih, MD on October 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Whitely Shelton on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Todd Hudspeth on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tiffany Shelton on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Robert Schlarb on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mitchell Shelton on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mitchell Brock Shelton on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Jennifer Greer on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Jana Alcorn on a date and at a time to be determined. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 1, 2018 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #97 EMERGENCY MOTION by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Protective Order. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 97 EMERGENCY MOTION by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dr. Shih CV, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Designations)(Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 96 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #94 Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Dr. Thomas C. Wright (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 95 AMENDED OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #88 Notice to Take Deposition of Jamie L. Sepulveda, M.D. (Gage, William) (Modified on 10/11/2018 to correct link) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. Thomas C. Wright on October 11, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (EDT) (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 93 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of le-Ming Shih, M.D. on October 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. EDT (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 92 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by C. R. Bard, Inc., Ryan P. McKeon, Lisa D. Hudspeth, Gregory L. Prine, Selena M. Mitseas, Johnson & Johnson, David Montgomery Jackson, Ethicon, Inc. (Cohen, Lori) (Modified on 9/18/2018 to add party filers) (lca). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 91 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #88 Notice to Take Deposition of Jamie L. Sepulveda, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Ie-Ming Shih, MD on September 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 89 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. W. Stuart Reynolds on September 13, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. (CDT) (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. Jamie L. Sepulveda on September 21, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 87 AMENDED RULE 45 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. W. Stuart Reynolds on September 10, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. CDT (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2187 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2187 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2187 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston and Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 85 RULE 45 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. W. Stuart Reynolds on September 7, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (CDT) (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Answers and Responses to Ethicon, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests Production. (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Answers and Response to Ethicon, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests Production. (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PRETRIAL ORDER # 283 (Amended Docket Control Order C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 275. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 7 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Active Bard Wave 7 Cases) (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa D. Hudspeth for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 78 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Lisa A. Hudspeth on May 3, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. CDT (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Lisa D. Hudspeth on May 3, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 76 CROSS-NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. Anita Chen on May 22, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 13, 2018 Filing 75 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Anita Chen, M.D. on May 22, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Attachment: #1 PTO #38)(Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Erin M. Wood on behalf of Lisa D. Hudspeth. (Wood, Erin) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel A. Gross on behalf of Lisa D. Hudspeth. (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Halli D. Cohn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Cohn, Halli) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by S. Eric Rumanek on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 69 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Lisa D. Hudspeth TO TRANSFER this member case from MDL 2187 C. R. Bard to MDL 2327 Ethicon. (Walker, Caroline) (Modified on 3/30/2018 to add party filer) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 68 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. Anita Chen on April 12, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. to 4:30 p.m. (EDT). (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 67 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. Anita Chen on April 12, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. to 4:30 p.m. (EDT) (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Caroline D. Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Lisa D. Hudspeth of Dr. Anita Chen on April 12, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. to 4:30 p.m. EDT. (Gross, Rachel) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
March 18, 2018 Filing 64 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Lisa D. Hudspeth. (MacLean, Leslie) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PRETRIAL ORDER # 275 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING C. R. BARD, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 7 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The stay on the Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases are incorporated in the C. R. Bard Wave 7 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 7 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 7 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 7 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mmw) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER on Motion filed in MDL 2187: granting MOTION by Leslie C. MacLean, Sara E. Coopwood, Rachel A. Gross, Erin M. Wood, Gibbs C. Henderson and Waters & Kraus, L.L.P. for Change of Address in this MDL and in each individual member cause in which they are associated. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the firm address, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2187 with which Leslie C. MacLean, Sara E. Coopwood, Rachel A. Gross, Erin M. Wood and/or Gibbs C. Henderson are associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 08/23/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mks) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
June 15, 2017 Filing 61 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Lisa D. Hudspeth. (MacLean, Leslie) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
June 15, 2017 Filing 60 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Lisa D. Hudspeth. (MacLean, Leslie) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
August 15, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Charles S. Siegel on behalf of Lisa D. Hudspeth. (Siegel, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting MOTION by Waters & Kraus, LLP for Substitution of Leslie C. MacLean and Withdrawal of Kyla G. Cole as Counsel filed in MDL No. 2187. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Kyla G. Cole as counsel for plaintiffs and to substitute Leslie C. MacLean as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2187 with which Kyla G. Cole is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/22/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mnm) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
May 4, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 15, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc., Ryan P. McKeon. (North, Richard) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 8, 2015 Filing 54 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 172 (Defendant C.R. Bard, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Documents and Testimony From Plaintiffs' Expert Bernd Klosterhalfen) entered on 04/07/2015 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 53 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Florida Middle; Case Number 3:14-cv-01465. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
April 7, 2015 Filing 52 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of West Virginia MDL case number: 2187 (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 17, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Charles S. Siegel, appearing on behalf of Lisa D Hudspeth (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX015293.). (TSW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 12, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #48 Reply to Response to Motion of Filing Supplement to Their Reply in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2327 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 9, 2015 Filing 50 DEFENDANT C.R. BARD, INC.'S Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Oppositions (Docs. 40 and 41) to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Aronson, Justin) Modified on 2/10/2015 to edit entry (CKS). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Selena M. Misteas. (Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to stay all proceedings pending transfer to MDL No. 2327 filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Transfer Order)(Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Charles S. Siegel, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/3/2015. (ADM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 30, 2015 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 Amended MOTION for Charles S. Siegel to appear pro hac vice filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, David Montgomery Jackson, Johnson & Johnson, Selena M. Misteas, Gregory L. Prine. (Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER terminating #43 motion to appear pro hac vice. Any response to #44 Amended Verified Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice shall be filed no later than February 9, 2015, or the Amended Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/27/2015. (ADM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 26, 2015 Filing 44 Amended MOTION for Charles S. Siegel to appear pro hac vice by Lisa D Hudspeth. (Nealis, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 26, 2015 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Charles S. Siegel to appear pro hac vice by Lisa D Hudspeth. (Nealis, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Reply; dismissing this case without prejudice as to Defendants Covidien LP and Sofradim Production SAS, denying as moot #38 Motion for Leave to Serve Limited Jurisdictional Requests for Admission. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/26/2015. (WG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to remand to State Court and Request for Oral Argument filed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Watt Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Tennessee Driver's License Law)(Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 22, 2015 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to remand to State Court and Request for Oral Argument and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ryan P. Mckeon. (Aronson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 21, 2015 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal against Covidien LP and Sofradim Production SAS, without Prejudice by Covidien LP, Sofradim Production SAS. (Anderson, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 13, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to file to Serve Limited Jurisdictional Requests for Admission in Advance of Rule 26 Meeting and for Order Requiring Expedited Responses to Same by Ethicon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Admissions to Plaintiff)(Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 13, 2015 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 9, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to file a Reply in Support of His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ryan P. Mckeon. (Aronson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
January 5, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION to remand to State Court and Request for Oral Argument by Lisa D Hudspeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Nealis, James) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 31, 2014 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Aronson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 31, 2014 Filing 33 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by C.R. Bard, Inc..(Aronson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Lori G. Cohen, Esq. has not already done so, she shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/30/2014. (ADM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lisa D Hudspeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nealis, James) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to stay all proceedings pending transfer to MDL No. 2327 filed by Lisa D Hudspeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Nealis, James) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Filing 29 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Covidien LP identifying Other Affiliate Covidien PLC for Covidien LP.. (Anderson, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Filing 28 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by Covidien LP.(Anderson, Scott) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Filing 27 Amended MOTION for Lori G. Cohen to appear pro hac vice by Ryan P. Mckeon. (Aronson, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #24 motion to appear pro hac vice, for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/29/2014. (ADM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for enlargement of time to conduct case management conference; the parties' pretrial compliance obligations under Local Rule 3.05 are suspended until further Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/29/2014.(SRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 29, 2014 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lori G. Cohen, Esq., appearing on behalf of Ryan P. Mckeon (Filing fee $10 receipt number JAX014735.). (TSW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 24 Verified MOTION for Lori G. Cohen to appear pro hac vice by Ryan P. Mckeon. (Aronson, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 24, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel Appearance by Justin Benjamin Aronson on behalf of Ryan P. Mckeon (Aronson, Justin) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 22 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Ethicon, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Kruppa, Andrew) (Modified on 12/29/2014 to edit text) (DSY). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by Johnson & Johnson. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by Ethicon, Inc. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by Ethicon, LLC. (Kruppa, Andrew) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 18 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Conduct Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines Pending Transfer of Case to MDL 2187 or Remand by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion to Vacate CTO) (Kruppa, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Modified on 12/29/2014 to edit text) (DSY). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion to extend deadline for plaintiff to respond to defendant Ryan P. McKeon's Motion to Dismiss to the extent that the Court will set a deadline for plaintiff's response by future Order; the Clerk is directed to modify plaintiff's motion so is it is not filed ex parte. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/18/2014.(SRW) Modified on 12/18/2014 to edit text (CKS). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 18, 2014 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S EXPARTE MOTION to extend the deadline to respond to defendant Ryan P. McKeon's Motion to dismiss plaintiff's first Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lisa D Hudspeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support of Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time, #2 Affidavit James G.T. Nealis, IV)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Gregory L. Prine re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice OF SERVING NOTICE OF DESIGNATION UNDER LOCAL RULE 3.05 (Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 12, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. T. Nealis, IV on behalf of Lisa D Hudspeth (Nealis, James) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 12, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION to stay all proceedings pending transfer to MDL No. 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Gregory L. Prine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bresky Order, #2 Exhibit B - Flagg Endorsed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Miller Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lowry, Patricia) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 11 CONSENT to Removal by David Montgomery Jackson (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 10 Consent to Removal by Ryan P. Mckeon (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ryan P. Mckeon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Selena M. Lessa. (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Lewis A. Watt. (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 6 DECLARATION of R. Clifton Merrell in Support of re #1 Notice of Removal. (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Ryan P. McKeon in Support of re: #1 Notice of Removal by Ryan P. Mckeon. (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by Selena M. Misteas.(originally filed in State Court)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #2 Amended Complaint by David Montgomery Jackson.(originally filed in State Court)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chris J. Bostain, C.R. Bard, Inc., Covidien LP, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, David Montgomery Jackson, Johnson & Johnson, Ryan P. Mckeon, Selena M. Misteas, Gregory L. Prine, Sofradim Production SAS with Jury Demand. filed by Lisa D Hudspeth.(originally filed in State Court)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit in and for Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2014-CA-4983-MA filed in State Court on 7/15/2014. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Gregory L. Prine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pt 1, #2 Exhibit State Court Pt 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/7/2015.] [Transferred from wvsd on 5/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudspeth v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selena M. Mitseas
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris J. Bostain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selena M. Lessa
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L. Prine
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Benjamin Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Halli D. Cohn
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Preston
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan P. Mckeon
Represented By: Janna S. Nugent
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Benjamin Aronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Preston
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Halli D. Cohn
Represented By: Amanda Elizabeth Preston
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Montgomery Jackson
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Lowry
Represented By: Andrew R. Kruppa
Represented By: Patricia E. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa D. Hudspeth
Represented By: Gregory A. Anderson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Represented By: Leslie C. MacLean
Represented By: Kyla Cole
Represented By: Erin M. Wood
Represented By: James G. T. Nealis, IV
Represented By: Rachel A. Gross
Represented By: Robert Chadwell Culpepper
Represented By: Melanie Trogolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?