D'Amico v. Inch et al
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Defendant: Mark Inch, Robert Smith, Joseph Edwards, Julie Jones and Scott A Heilig
Case Number: 3:2020cv00622
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 RETURN of Service unexecuted as to Defendant Heilig.(CAW)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of special appointment; directing service of process on defendant; notice to plaintiff; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/23/2020. (CAW)
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/19/2020. (JW)
June 18, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida (Tallahassee). Case assigned to District Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-622-J-34PDB. (PAM)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00446. File received electronically
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 17] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The #17 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall also close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/17/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
June 15, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #16 Amended Complaint filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO - R&R flag set (rcb)**Objections to #17 were not filed by 6/12/2020** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - R&R flag set. In light of the foregoing, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/12/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 5/15/2020. (rcb)[Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
May 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #16 Second Amended Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCOTT A HEILIG, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb)**Plaintiff wrote "3rd Amended" on Complaint** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers on 6/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the second amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff has until June 1, 2020, to file a second amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's second amended complaint, or no later than June 1, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 4/27/2020. (rcb) *** 1983 Complaint Form forwarded as directed** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2020. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv446-MW/MAF. [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
December 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #13 First Amended Complaint. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCOTT A HEILIG, JULIE JONES, ROBERT SMITH, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb)***No service copies provided*** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Plaintiff has until 12/18/2019, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms, in accordance with the prior Order, ECF No. #8. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than 12/18/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 12/03/2019. (rcb) Modified on 12/3/2019 (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: #11 Order Accepting Report and Recommendation. This case is REMANDED to Judge Stampelos. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The #7 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted, over Plaintiff's objections, as this Court's opinion. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #5, is DENIED. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Further, the Clerk is directed to refile the motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #5, in Case No. 4:18cv494, in light of Plaintiff's objections. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/2/2019. (cle) Per this Order, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction has been docketed in 4:18-cv-494. [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re: #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #10 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Notify Chambers on 12/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2019. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. #4, is GRANTED to the extent the filing fee does not have to be prepaid. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order with appropriate cover letter, to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel, 501 South Calhoun Street, Tallahassee, Florida 32399-2500. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/18/2019. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER.The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff shall have until December 18, 2019, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended complaint or no later than December 18, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/18/2019. (rcb)*** 1983 complaint mailed as directed*** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, ECF No. #5, be DENIED and this case be REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/18/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/16/2019. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Change of Address. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by STEVEN F D'AMICO ***Address updated to Wakulla Correctional Institution, 110 Melaleuca Drive, Crawfordville, Florida 32327 from Reception and Medical Center, PO BOX 628, Lake Butler, Florida 32054*** (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packetfor requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 10/15/2019, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supported by a computer printout of the transactions in Plaintiffs inmate bank account for the 6-month period of time preceding the initiation of this case, or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full) The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 10/15/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 09/12/2019. (rcb)***IFP Motion mailed as directed*** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
September 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEVEN F D'AMICO. (rcb) Modified on 9/11/2019 (rcb). ***No service copies or IFP motion received*** [Transferred from flnd on 6/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Amico v. Inch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Heilig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?