Jones v. University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine et al
Plaintiff: MD Shirley E Jones and Shirley E. Jones
Defendant: MD Charles J Haddad, MD Nipa R Shah, University of Florida Department of Community Health, College of Medicine, Nipa R. Shah, Charles J. Haddad and University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine
Case Number: 3:2020cv00737
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Time Enlargement to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to #6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before October 26, 2020 or else the Motion will be considered unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/28/2020. (TAM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Time Enlargment to Respond to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Shirley E. Jones. (Jones, J.) Modified to edit text and event type on 8/25/2020 (KKH).
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Charles J. Haddad, Nipa R. Shah. (Wright, Todd)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; directing plaintiff to file her response to defendants' motion to dismiss and to quash for improper and insufficient service of process #6 no later than 8/24/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/10/2020.(SRW)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Charles J. Haddad, Nipa R. Shah, University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine. (Wright, Todd)
July 18, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION to re #1 Notice of Removal and MOTION to Remand filed by Shirley E. Jones. (Jones, J.) Modified to edit event type and text on 7/20/2020 (KKH).
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Charles J. Haddad, Nipa R. Shah, University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine. (Wright, Todd)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing re #1 Notice of Removal by Charles J. Haddad, Nipa R. Shah, University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wright, Todd) Modified to edit text on 7/7/2020 (KKH).
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-737-J-32JBT. (SJB)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Charles J. Haddad, Nipa R. Shah, University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine with Jury Demand, originally filed as First Amended Complaint on 6/3/2020 in the Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County filed by Shirley E. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KKH)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-001307 filed in State Court on March 03, 2020 7:48 PM. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17009192 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 State Court COMPLAINT, # 2 AMENDED State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Michelle) Modified to edit text and attachments 1 & 2 removed due to personal identifiers. 7/6/2020 (KKH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Shirley E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley E. Jones
Represented By: J. Eric Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Charles J Haddad
Represented By: Michelle Bedoya Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Nipa R Shah
Represented By: Michelle Bedoya Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Florida Department of Community Health, College of Medicine
Represented By: Michelle Bedoya Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nipa R. Shah
Represented By: Michelle Bedoya Barnett
Represented By: Todd Anderson Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Haddad
Represented By: Michelle Bedoya Barnett
Represented By: Todd Anderson Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Florida (UF) Department of Community Health and Family Medicine, College of Medicine
Represented By: Michelle Bedoya Barnett
Represented By: Todd Anderson Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?