Woodard v. Gaylord
Plaintiff: MELVIN WOODARD
Defendant: Gaylord
Case Number: 3:2020cv00775
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Affidavit of Indigency by Melvin Woodard. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gaylord filed by Melvin Woodard. (Attachment: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/2020. (CKS)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-00775-BJD-MCR. (AEJ)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00302. File received electronically
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The #4 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall also close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/13/2020. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/13/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION- R&R flag set. In light of the foregoing, and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/10/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/12/2020. (rcb)[Transferred from flnd on 7/13/2020.]
June 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #2 Florida Department of Corrections Trust Fund Account Statemen #1 Complaint. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/13/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (rcb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2020) (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 7/13/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Florida Department of Corrections Trust Fund Account Statement by MELVIN WOODARD (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/13/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GAYLORD, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (rcb)**No Service Copy of IFP Motion** [Transferred from flnd on 7/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELVIN WOODARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?