Woodard v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Defendant: Mrs. Wilson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00793
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying as moot #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/26/2020. (CAW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Affidavit of Indigency by Melvin Woodard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered July 20, 2020, is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/22/2020. (RH)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice, with instructions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/20/2020. (ACT)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New Case Number: 3:20-cv-793-J-34MCR. (KEM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00295. File received electronically
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida - Jacksonville located at Bryan Simpson U.S. Courthouse, Office of the Clerk, 300 North Hogan Street, Jacksonville, FL 32202. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (ECF No. #4) is adopted and incorporated by reference in this order of the court. The clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 7/7/2020. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
July 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Complaint. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Jacksonville Division, for all further proceedings. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/4/2020. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/2/2020. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
June 4, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (cle) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILSON, filed by MELVIN WOODARD. (cle) *** No Service Copy provided. No IFP filed. *** [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?