Hendley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Yolanda Hendley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00797
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service as to US Attorney General executed on 8/20/20 by Yolanda Hendley (KKH)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service, as to the Commissioner of Social Security executed on 8/20/20 by Yolanda Hendley (KKH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 RETRUN of service as to the US Attorney, executed on 8/18/2020 by Yolanda Hendley (KKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (KKH)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER advising pro se plaintiff of some procedural rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/6/2020. (ADM)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, with directions to the Clerk and Plaintiff. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/30/2020. (ADM)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/24/2020. (MD)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Yolanda Hendley. (KKH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Yolanda Hendley. (KKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Hendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?